This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 06:01:48 (UTC).

US v. Christopher Kelly

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 US filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Christopher Kelly. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6011

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

CHRISTOPHER KELLY

Atlanta, GA 30315-0182

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Paresh S. Patel Esq.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER

6411 Ivy Lane

Greenbelt, MD 20770-1405

Dwight Everette Crawley

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DWIGHT CRAWLEY

1300 I Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Christopher Kelly

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY ATLANTA

P. O. Box 150160

Atlanta, GA 30315-0182

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Michael Clayton Hanlon Esq.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

36 South Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#2

Counsel notice

#1

(#1) 2255 case docketed. Originating case number: 1:06-cr-00222-CCB-2,1:16-cv-01863-CCB. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/26/2019. Case manager: REdwards. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:44 PM]

2 #1

Informal Briefing order

7 #2

Envelope

9 #2

Order

7 #1

MOTION

9 #1

Informal opening brief (pro se cases, no paper copies required)

#3

(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/16/2020. [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:42 PM]

#8

(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 02/26/2020. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Christopher Kelly. [1000666694] [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:03 AM]

9 #3

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#10) SEALED DOCUMENT (court access only) by Christopher Kelly Document type: Postsentence report filed as part of informal brief. Filed Ex parte: Y. [1000672227] [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Christopher Kelly. [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/29/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 7 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Brief due 02/26/2020. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Christopher Kelly. [1000666694] [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Christopher Kelly to extend filing time for informal opening brief. [1000666689] [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/22/2020 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#6) SEALED district court document (court access only). Description of document: Presentencing Report. Originating case number: 1:06-cr-00222-CCB-2,1:16-cv-01863-CCB. [20-6011] AD [Entered: 01/07/2020 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:06-cr-00222-CCB-2,1:16-cv-01863-CCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? No. [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/06/2020 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) SEALED district court document (court access only). Description of document: Presentence Report. Originating case number: 1:06-cr-00222-CCB-2,1:16-cv-01863-CCB. [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/06/2020 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/16/2020. [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Christopher Kelly. Informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020. [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 2255 case docketed. Originating case number: 1:06-cr-00222-CCB-2,1:16-cv-01863-CCB. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/26/2019. Case manager: REdwards. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [20-6011] RE [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less