This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 06:11:41 (UTC).

US v. Buckardt

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 US filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Buckardt. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1326

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

 

Party Details

Defendant

SNOHOMISH COUNTY

Defendant / Appellants

D'SKELL AGAPE SOCIETY

Po Box 1142

Stanwood, WA 98292

KAREN A. BUCKARDT, aka K.A. Buckardt

Stanwood, WA 98292

ELMER J. BUCKARDT, aka E.J. Buckardt

Stanwood, WA 98292

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

D'Skell Agape Society

Po Box 1142

Stanwood, WA 98292

Karen A. Buckardt

Po Box 1142

Stanwood, WA 98292

Elmer J. Buckardt

Po Box 1142

Stanwood, WA 98292

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Director, Tax Division

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 502, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Ivan Clay Dale

Attorney at Department of Justice

Po Box 502, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Clerk's Letter to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit: Transfer Letter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [750560] [MMA] [Entered: 01/21/2021 01:04 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER filed granting the United States' motion [ # 4 ] to the extent that this matter and all pending motions [ # 9 ] [ # 10 ] [ # 11 ] are transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [750479] [LMS] [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:22 AM]

#11

(#11) MODIFIED ENTRY: RESPONSE of Appellants Elmer J. Buckardt and Karen A. Buckardt to the motion to terminate appeal [ # 4 ] filed by Appellee US in 21-1326 with MOTION for finding facts and conclusion of law. Service: 12/18/2020 by clerk [744018]--[Edited 12/21/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/18/2020 04:46 PM]

#10

(#10) MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellant Elmer J. Buckardt for leave to proceed without an attorney representing D'Skell Agape Society or to extend time. Service: 12/14/2020 by clerk. [742206]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/14/2020 08:47 AM]

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) MODIFIED ENTRY: Certificate of Interest for Appellants Elmer J. Buckardt, Karen A. Buckardt and D'Skell Agape Society. Service: 12/10/2020 by clerk. [741956]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:38 PM]

#7

(#7) MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance for Appellant Karen A. Buckardt. Service: 12/10/2020 by clerk. [741955]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:38 PM]

#6

(#6) Paper document received from D'Skell Agape Society. [741954] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:37 PM]

#5

(#5) MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance for Appellant Elmer J. Buckardt. Service: 12/10/2020 by clerk. [741953]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:37 PM]

#4

(#4) MOTION of Appellee US to terminate appeal through dismissal for lack of jurisdiction. Cases to be terminated: 21-1326. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion).. Service: 12/03/2020 by US mail, email. [740051] [21-1326] [Ivan Dale] [Entered: 12/03/2020 02:39 PM]

#3

(#3) Letter to Elmer J. Buckardt regarding the representation of Appellant D'Skell Agape Society. Only a member of the bar of this court may represent the party. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [738790] [MMA] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:22 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Ivan C. Dale as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 11/30/2020 by US mail, email. [738733] [21-1326] [Ivan Dale] [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:05 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's Letter to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit: Transfer Letter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [750560] [MMA] [Entered: 01/21/2021 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER filed granting the United States' motion [ # 4 ] to the extent that this matter and all pending motions [ # 9 ] [ # 10 ] [ # 11 ] are transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [750479] [LMS] [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MODIFIED ENTRY: RESPONSE of Appellants Elmer J. Buckardt and Karen A. Buckardt to the motion to terminate appeal [ # 4 ] filed by Appellee US in 21-1326 with MOTION for finding facts and conclusion of law. Service: 12/18/2020 by clerk [744018]--[Edited 12/21/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/18/2020 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellant Elmer J. Buckardt for leave to proceed without an attorney representing D'Skell Agape Society or to extend time. Service: 12/14/2020 by clerk. [742206]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/14/2020 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MODIFIED ENTRY: MOTION of Appellant Elmer J. Buckardt for leave to proceed in Forma Pauperis. Service: 12/10/2020 by clerk. [741958]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MODIFIED ENTRY: Certificate of Interest for Appellants Elmer J. Buckardt, Karen A. Buckardt and D'Skell Agape Society. Service: 12/10/2020 by clerk. [741956]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance for Appellant Karen A. Buckardt. Service: 12/10/2020 by clerk. [741955]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Paper document received from D'Skell Agape Society. [741954] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MODIFIED ENTRY: Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance for Appellant Elmer J. Buckardt. Service: 12/10/2020 by clerk. [741953]--[Edited 12/14/2020 by MMA] [JCP] [Entered: 12/10/2020 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION of Appellee US to terminate appeal through dismissal for lack of jurisdiction. Cases to be terminated: 21-1326. (Briefing suspended pursuant to FCR 31 pending resolution of the motion).. Service: 12/03/2020 by US mail, email. [740051] [21-1326] [Ivan Dale] [Entered: 12/03/2020 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Elmer J. Buckardt regarding the representation of Appellant D'Skell Agape Society. Only a member of the bar of this court may represent the party. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [738790] [MMA] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Ivan C. Dale as counsel for Appellee US. Service: 11/30/2020 by US mail, email. [738733] [21-1326] [Ivan Dale] [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 11/09/2020. [738435] Fee/IFP due on 12/09/2020. Entry of Appearance due 12/09/2020. Appellants' Informal brief is due 12/21/2020. [MMA] [Entered: 11/25/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNOHOMISH COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ivan C. Dale