This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 05:51:45 (UTC).

US v. Ayala-Vazquez

Case Summary

On 09/19/2021 US filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ayala-Vazquez. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1734

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Appellee

UNITED STATES

Defendant / Appellant

ANGEL AYALA-VAZQUEZ, a/k/a El Buster, a/k/a El Negro, a/k/a Angelo Millones Papa Upa

Adelanto, CA 92301-0000

Interested Parties

MABEL MERCADO-LOPEZ

MARIA-DE-LOURDES MARQUES-GARCIA

ALEXIS ROBLEDO-VAZQUEZ

ALEDES, INC.

CITIMORTGAGE, INC.

POPULAR AUTO, INC.

ABNLLYS VAZQUEZ

JOSE ALAMO-RODRIGUEZ

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Scott H. Anderson

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Mariana E. Bauza Almonte

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

David Christian Bornstein

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Olga B. Castellon-Miranda

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Myriam Yvette Fernandez-Gonzalez

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Jonathan L. Gottfried

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Timothy R. Henwood

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Jenifer Yois Hernandez-Vega

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Steven Liong-Rodriguez

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Edwin Giovannie Mercado

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Juan Carlos Reyes-Ramos

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Cesar S. Rivera-Giraud

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Jose A. Ruiz-Santiago

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Enrique Silva-Aviles

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Warren Vazquez

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Angel Ayala-Vazquez

Attorney at USP Victorville

Po Box 3900

Adelanto, CA 92301-0000

Rafael F. Castro Lang

Attorney at Rafael F.Castro Lang Law Office

Po Box 9023222

San Juan, PR 00902-3222

Nathan Philip Diamond

888 Biscayne Blvd

Miami, FL 33132

Julio M. Marcano-Lopez

623 Ponce De Leon Ave

San Juan, PR 00917-0000

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #4381) filed by Appellant Angel Ayala-Vazquez. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 10/07/2021 . [21-1734] (GB) [Entered: 09/23/2021 08:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Popular Auto LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. by Caliber Home Loans Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant