This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2020 at 06:02:37 (UTC).

US Sec. & Exch. Commission v. Masiz

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 US Sec Exch Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Masiz. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1896

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendants

GREGORY S. KRONING

CRAIG MEDOFF

Boston, MA 02114

BIOCHEMICS, INC.

Interested Parties

JOHN J. AQUINO, Chapter 7 Trustee of Inpellis, Inc.

MARK G. DEGIACOMO

Boston, MA 02110-0000

INPELLIS, INC.

ADEC PRIVATE EQUITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

PHOENIX CAPITAL RESOURCES, LLC

Defendant / Appellant

JOHN MASIZ

Plaintiff / Appellee

US SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Orestes G. Brown

Attorney at Metaxas Brown Pidgeon LLP

900 Cummings Ctr, Ste 207T

Beverly, MA 01915-0000

Keith L. Sachs

Attorney at DDSK Law LLC

900 Cummings Ctr, Ste 210U

Beverly, MA 01915

Craig Medoff

25 Hancock St

Boston, MA 02114

Francis J. DiMento Sr.

Attorney at DiMento & Sullivan

7 Faneuil Hall Marketplace, 3Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02109-6113

Douglas Thomas Radigan

Attorney at Bowditch & Dewey LLP

311 Main St, Po Box 15156

Worcester, MA 01608

Jan Richard Schlichtmann

Po Box 233

Beverly, MA 01965-0000

Michael P. Angelini

Attorney at Bowditch & Dewey LLP

311 Main St, Po Box 15156

Worcester, MA 01608

John A. Sten

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

225 Franklin St, 26Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110

Interested Party Attorneys

Donald F. Farrell Jr.

Attorney at Anderson Aquino LLP

240 Lewis Wharf

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Jonathan M. Horne

Attorney at Murtha Cullina LLP

99 High St, 20Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Mark G. DeGiacomo

Attorney at Murtha Cullina LLP

99 High St, 20Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Howard M. Cooper

Attorney at Todd & Weld LLP

1 Federal St, 27Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2012

Jonathan M. Albano

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-1726

Joseph M. Cacace

Attorney at Todd & Weld LLP

1 Federal St, 27Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2012

Michael J. Fencer

Attorney at Casner & Edwards LLP

303 Congress St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Martin F. Healey

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

33 Arch St, 24Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1424

Joshua S. Grinspoon

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

33 Arch St, 24Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1424

Carol E. Schultze

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

100 F St Ne

Washington, DC 20549

David H. London

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

33 Arch St, 24Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1424

Kathleen Burdette Shields

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

33 Arch St, 24Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1424

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Craig Medoff. Copy of Notice issued September 16, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1896] (JMK) [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:58 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US Securities & Exchange Commission filed by Attorney Theodore J. Weiman. Certificate of service dated 10/01/2020. [20-1896] (TW) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:38 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Craig Medoff. Copy of Order entered September 21, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1896] (JMK) [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:25 PM]

Open Document

ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge: The appellant's emergency motion for a stay of the September 22, 2020 BioChemics/Inpellis auction pending appeal is denied . [20-1896] (CMP) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:23 PM]

Open Document #2

EMERGENCY MOTION to stay September 22, 2020 Auction filed by Appellant John Masiz. Certificate of service dated 09/18/2020. [20-1896] (JRS) [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:06 AM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant John Masiz indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896] (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:02 PM]

Open Document #3

NOTICE of filing in the United States Supreme Court filed by Appellant John Masiz. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 11:23 AM]

Open Document #2

NOTICE of filing in the United States Supreme Court filed by Appellant John Masiz. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 11:23 AM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant John Masiz indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896] CLERK'S NOTE: The transcript report order form lacks the signature of the filer. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:19 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant John Masiz. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896] (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:15 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Craig Medoff. Copy of Notice issued September 16, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1896] (JMK) [Entered: 10/06/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee US Securities & Exchange Commission filed by Attorney Theodore J. Weiman. Certificate of service dated 10/01/2020. [20-1896] (TW) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Not Party Craig Medoff. Copy of Order entered September 21, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1896] (JMK) [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge and David J. Barron, Appellate Judge: The appellant's emergency motion for a stay of the September 22, 2020 BioChemics/Inpellis auction pending appeal is denied . [20-1896] (CMP) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION to stay September 22, 2020 Auction filed by Appellant John Masiz. Certificate of service dated 09/18/2020. [20-1896] (JRS) [Entered: 09/18/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant John Masiz indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896] (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of filing in the United States Supreme Court filed by Appellant John Masiz. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant John Masiz indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896] CLERK'S NOTE: The transcript report order form lacks the signature of the filer. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS. (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant John Masiz. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896] (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant John Masiz filed by Attorney Jan Schlichtmann. Certificate of service dated 09/17/2020. [20-1896] (JRS) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #676) filed by Appellant John Masiz. Docketing Statement due 09/30/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 09/30/2020. Appearance form due 09/30/2020. [20-1896] (CMP) [Entered: 09/16/2020 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADEC PRIVATE EQUITY INVESTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carol Elizabeth Schultze