This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2020 at 06:00:22 (UTC).

US Sec. & Exch. Commission v. Masiz

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 US Sec Exch Commission filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Masiz. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1177

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendants

GREGORY S. KRONING

CRAIG MEDOFF

Boston, MA 02114

BIOCHEMICS, INC.

Interested Parties

JOHN J. AQUINO, Chapter 7 Trustee of Inpellis, Inc.

MARK G. DEGIACOMO

Boston, MA 02110-0000

ADEC PRIVATE EQUITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

INPELLIS, INC.

PHOENIX CAPITAL RESOURCES, LLC

Defendant / Appellant

JOHN MASIZ

Plaintiff / Appellee

US SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Orestes G. Brown

Attorney at Metaxas Brown Pidgeon LLP

900 Cummings Ctr, Ste 207T

Beverly, MA 01915-0000

Keith L. Sachs

Attorney at DDSK Law LLC

900 Cummings Ctr, Ste 210U

Beverly, MA 01915

Craig Medoff

25 Hancock St

Boston, MA 02114

Francis J. DiMento Sr.

Attorney at DiMento & Sullivan

7 Faneuil Hall Marketplace, 3Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02109-6113

Douglas Thomas Radigan

Attorney at Bowditch & Dewey LLP

311 Main St, Po Box 15156

Worcester, MA 01608

Jan Richard Schlichtmann

Po Box 233

Beverly, MA 01965-0000

Michael P. Angelini

Attorney at Bowditch & Dewey LLP

311 Main St, Po Box 15156

Worcester, MA 01608

John A. Sten

Attorney at Pierce Atwood LLP

100 Summer St, Ste 2250

Boston, MA 02110

Interested Party Attorneys

Donald F. Farrell Jr.

Attorney at Anderson Aquino LLP

240 Lewis Wharf

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Taruna Garg

Attorney at Murtha Cullina LLP

99 High St, 20Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-0000

Howard M. Cooper

Attorney at Todd & Weld LLP

1 Federal St, 27Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2012

Elizabeth M. Bresnahan

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-1726

Jonathan M. Albano

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-1726

Joseph M. Cacace

Attorney at Todd & Weld LLP

1 Federal St, 27Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-2012

Michael J. Fencer

Attorney at Casner & Edwards LLP

303 Congress St

Boston, MA 02210-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Martin F. Healey

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

33 Arch St, 24Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1424

Joshua S. Grinspoon

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

33 Arch St, 24Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1424

Carol E. Schultze

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

100 F St Ne

Washington, DC 20549

David H. London

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

33 Arch St, 24Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1424

Kathleen Burdette Shields

Attorney at US Securities & Exchange Commission

33 Arch St, 24Th Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1424

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 03/31/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Carol E. Schultze for US Securities & Exchange Commission. [20-1177] (CMP) [Entered: 03/17/2020 11:15 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant John Masiz indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 03/17/2020. [20-1177] (JRS) [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:51 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant John Masiz filed by Attorney Jan Schlichtmann. Certificate of service dated 03/17/2020. [20-1177] (JRS) [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:50 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Transcripts Filed

Open Document #2

Notice Of Appearance

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #4

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 03/31/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Carol E. Schultze for US Securities & Exchange Commission. [20-1177] (CMP) [Entered: 03/17/2020 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant John Masiz indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 03/17/2020. [20-1177] (JRS) [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant John Masiz filed by Attorney Jan Schlichtmann. Certificate of service dated 03/17/2020. [20-1177] (JRS) [Entered: 03/17/2020 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant John Masiz in 20-1177. Certificate of service dated 03/16/2020. [20-1177] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 19-2206. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JRS) [Entered: 03/16/2020 09:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #605) filed by Appellant John Masiz. Docketing Statement, Appearance Form, and Transcript Report/Order form due 03/16/2020. [20-1177]. (RMK) [Entered: 03/02/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADEC PRIVATE EQUITY INVESTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carol Elizabeth Schultze

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID H. LONDON