This case was last updated from PACER on 05/04/2019 at 06:02:51 (UTC).

US ex rel Complin v. NC Baptist Hospital

Case Summary

On 03/05/2019 US ex rel Complin filed an Other lawsuit against NC Baptist Hospital. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1243

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CHARLOTTE-MECKLENBURG HOSPITAL AUTHORITY, d/b/a Carolinas HealthCare System

NORTH CAROLINA BAPTIST HOSPITAL

Plaintiff / Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EX REL COMPLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sandra L.W. Miller

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

P. O. Box 10208

Greenville, SC 29603-0208

Catherine Farrell Wrenn

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

P. O. Box 10208

Greenville, SC 29603-0208

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William Paul Lawrence II

Attorney at WATERS & KRAUS, LLP

37163 Mountville Road

Middleburg, VA 20117

Chet Rabon Jr.

Attorney at RABON LAW FIRM, PLLC

225 East Worthington Avenue

Charlotte, NC 28203

Other Attorneys

Cheryl Thornton Sloan

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

101 South Edgeworth Street

Greensboro, NC 27401-0000

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Catherine F. Wrenn for North Carolina Baptist Hospital. [1000478515] [19-1243] Catherine Wrenn [Entered: 03/19/2019 04:49 PM]

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by North Carolina Baptist Hospital. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000477169] [19-1243] Sandra Miller [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:58 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00420-WO-LPA. Case manager: KStump. [19-1243] KS [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:53 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sandra L.W. Miller for Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority and North Carolina Baptist Hospital. [1000477166] [19-1243] Sandra Miller [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:56 AM]

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000477168] [19-1243] Sandra Miller [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:57 AM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: William Paul Lawrence II, Philip J. Mohr. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/15/2019. Response Brief due 05/15/2019. [19-1243] KS [Entered: 03/05/2019 03:00 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charles H. Rabon, Jr. for United States of America ex rel Complin. [1000475192] [19-1243] Chet Rabon [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:09 PM]

#15

(#15) ORDER filed [1000498930] updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 05/29/2019. Response brief due 06/28/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1243] KS [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:18 PM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER filed [1000485346] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/29/2019. Response brief due 05/29/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1243] AB [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:31 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00420-WO-LPA. Mailed to: William Paul Lawrence II, Philip J. Mohr. [19-1243] KS [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:56 PM]

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by United States of America ex rel Complin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000474445] [19-1243] William Lawrence [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:29 PM]

#8

(#8) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1243] LP [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:35 AM]

#7

(#7) Amended DOCKETING STATEMENT by United States of America ex rel Complin. [19-1243] William Lawrence [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:59 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Wm. Paul Lawrence, II for United States of America ex rel Complin. [1000474220] [19-1243] William Lawrence [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:56 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER filed [1000498930] updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 05/29/2019. Response brief due 06/28/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1243] KS [Entered: 04/23/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER filed [1000485346] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/29/2019. Response brief due 05/29/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1243] AB [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Catherine F. Wrenn for North Carolina Baptist Hospital. [1000478515] [19-1243] Catherine Wrenn [Entered: 03/19/2019 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by North Carolina Baptist Hospital. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000477169] [19-1243] Sandra Miller [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000477168] [19-1243] Sandra Miller [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Sandra L.W. Miller for Charlotte-Mecklenburg Hospital Authority and North Carolina Baptist Hospital. [1000477166] [19-1243] Sandra Miller [Entered: 03/18/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charles H. Rabon, Jr. for United States of America ex rel Complin. [1000475192] [19-1243] Chet Rabon [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1243] LP [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended DOCKETING STATEMENT by United States of America ex rel Complin. [19-1243] William Lawrence [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by United States of America ex rel Complin. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000474445] [19-1243] William Lawrence [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (ENTRY RESTRICTED) DOCKETING STATEMENT by United States of America ex rel Complin. [19-1243]--[Edited 03/12/2019 by KS - see ECF 7] William Lawrence [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Wm. Paul Lawrence, II for United States of America ex rel Complin. [1000474220] [19-1243] William Lawrence [Entered: 03/12/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: William Paul Lawrence II, Philip J. Mohr. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/15/2019. Response Brief due 05/15/2019. [19-1243] KS [Entered: 03/05/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00420-WO-LPA. Mailed to: William Paul Lawrence II, Philip J. Mohr. [19-1243] KS [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:09-cv-00420-WO-LPA. Case manager: KStump. [19-1243] KS [Entered: 03/05/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.