This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2019 at 06:04:30 (UTC).

US Dep't of Justice v. Rico Jonas

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 US Dep't of Justice filed an Other lawsuit against Rico Jonas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1243

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Respondent

MICHELLE RICCO JONAS

Amicus Curiae

AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW HAMPSHIRE

AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Seth R. Aframe

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Respondent Attorneys

Anthony J. Galdieri

Attorney at NH Attorney General's Office

33 Capitol St

Concord, NH 03301-0000

Lawrence M. Edelman

Attorney at NH Attorney General's Office

33 Capitol St

Concord, NH 03301-0000

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Nathan Wessler

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad St, 18Th Flr

New York, NY 10004-0000

Jennifer Stisa Granick

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

39 Drumm St

San Francisco, CA 94111-0000

Brett Max Kaufman

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad St, 18Th Flr

New York, NY 10004-0000

Henry R. Klementowicz

Attorney at ACLU of New Hampshire

18 Low Ave

Concord, NH 03301-0000

Gilles R. Bissonnette

Attorney at ACLU of New Hampshire

18 Low Ave

Concord, NH 03301-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document

ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL record filed consisting of district court docket entry no. 11 (Report and Recommendation). [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:00 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice filed by Attorney Seth R. Aframe. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1243] (SRA) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:37 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas filed by Attorney Lawrence M. Edelman. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1243] (LME) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:12 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas filed by Attorney Anthony Galdieri. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1243] (AJG) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:15 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1243] (LME) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:17 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas indicating transcripts are not necessary. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1243] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect and/or incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (LME) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:29 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 05/24/2019 , the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Jennifer Stisa Granick for American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire. [19-1243] (TS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:50 AM]

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Brief due 05/16/2019 for appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Appendix due 05/16/2019 for appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:43 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Certificate of service dated 05/03/2019. [19-1243] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (LME) [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:31 PM]

Open Document

AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire in support of Appellant. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/06/2019 . [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:57 AM]

Open Document

ORDER entered by William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge: The amicus brief filed by ACLU and ACLU of New Hampshire, is accepted for filing on this day. [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:50 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movants American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire filed by Attorney Henry Klementowicz. Certificate of service dated 04/19/2019. [19-1243] (HRK) [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:17 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION AND AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW HAMPSHIRE filed by Attorney Gilles Bissonnette. Certificate of service dated 04/18/2019. [19-1243] (GRB) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:44 AM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movants American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire. [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:00 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice to motion to stay [ # 6247423-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2019. [19-1243] (SRA) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:49 PM]

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 05/24/2019 , the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Jennifer Stisa Granick for American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire. [19-1243] (TS) [Entered: 05/10/2019 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Brief due 05/16/2019 for appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Appendix due 05/16/2019 for appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Certificate of service dated 05/03/2019. [19-1243] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (LME) [Entered: 05/03/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6250049-2 ] submitted by Amici Curiae American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire. [19-1243] (JMK) [Entered: 05/01/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire in support of Appellant. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2019. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/06/2019 . [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered by William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge: The amicus brief filed by ACLU and ACLU of New Hampshire, is accepted for filing on this day. [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 04/29/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movants American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire filed by Attorney Henry Klementowicz. Certificate of service dated 04/19/2019. [19-1243] (HRK) [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION AND AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NEW HAMPSHIRE filed by Attorney Gilles Bissonnette. Certificate of service dated 04/18/2019. [19-1243] (GRB) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Movants American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of New Hampshire. [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice to motion to stay [ # 6247423-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2019. [19-1243] (SRA) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to file oversized Motion to Stay District Court Judgment Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1243] (AJG) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD filed consisting of district court docket entry nos. 23, 25, 26 (Order denying motion to stay pending appeal). [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/06/2019 for appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Appendix due 05/06/2019 for appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas indicating transcripts are not necessary. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1243] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect and/or incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (LME) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1243] (LME) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas filed by Attorney Anthony Galdieri. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1243] (AJG) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas filed by Attorney Lawrence M. Edelman. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1243] (LME) [Entered: 03/14/2019 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee United States Department of Justice filed by Attorney Seth R. Aframe. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1243] (SRA) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ELECTRONIC SUPPLEMENTAL record filed consisting of district court docket entry no. 11 (Report and Recommendation). [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #20) filed by Appellant Michelle Ricco Jonas. Docketing Statement due 03/26/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/26/2019. Appearance form due 03/26/2019. [19-1243] (CP) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.