This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/27/2022 at 06:12:14 (UTC).

U.S. Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 U S Bank, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16682

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

Defendants

ARLINGTON WEST TWILIGHT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

ZILIAN OU

Plaintiff / Appellee

U.S. BANK, N.A., as Trustee, in Trust for the Benefit of the Holders of Bayview Opportunity Master Fund IVA REMIC Trust 2016-17NPL3 Beneficial Interest Certificates, Series 2016-17NPL3

Defendant / Appellant

SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ariel Edward Stern Esquire

Scott Lachman

Natalie L. Winslow Esquire

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Karen Hanks

Chantel Schimming

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 17 ] submitted by U.S. Bank, N.A. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 18 ] submitted by U.S. Bank, N.A. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12615638] (KWG) [Entered: 12/21/2022 11:22 AM]

18 #5

ER VOL 4

18 #4

ER VOL 3

18 #3

ER VOL 2

18 #2

ER VOL 1

18 #1

APPELLEE'S INDEX VOLUME TO SUPPLEMENTAL EXCERPTS OF RECORD

#17

(#17) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 12/20/2022. [12615322] [22-16682] (Lachman, Scott) [Entered: 12/20/2022 07:00 PM]

#16

(#16) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) In light of appellees representation at Docket Entry No. [ # 13 ] that it will sua sponte postpone the sale should a ruling not be issued prior to the scheduled sale date, appellants motion to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]) is denied as moot. The court has received appellants motion for an injunction pending appeal, which seeks relief on or before January 30, 2023. Any response to the motion remains due December 27, 2022. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. The Clerk will place this appeal on the next available calendar after the completion of briefing. See 9th Cir. Gen. Order 3.3(f). [12614896] (JMR) [Entered: 12/20/2022 12:09 PM]

#13

(#16) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) In light of appellees representation at Docket Entry No. [ # 13 ] that it will sua sponte postpone the sale should a ruling not be issued prior to the scheduled sale date, appellants motion to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]) is denied as moot. The court has received appellants motion for an injunction pending appeal, which seeks relief on or before January 30, 2023. Any response to the motion remains due December 27, 2022. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. The Clerk will place this appeal on the next available calendar after the completion of briefing. See 9th Cir. Gen. Order 3.3(f). [12614896] (JMR) [Entered: 12/20/2022 12:09 PM]

#7

(#9) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 7 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. [12600194] (SD) [Entered: 12/01/2022 01:34 PM]

#6

(#10) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 6 ] filed by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. [12600204] (SD) [Entered: 12/01/2022 01:38 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/30/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12588483] (VS) [Entered: 11/16/2022 09:25 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/03/2022. [12579934] [22-16682] (Hanks, Karen) [Entered: 11/03/2022 04:06 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed October 26, 2022 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due no later than November 23, 2022; the answering brief is due December 21, 2022 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12577293] (JMR) [Entered: 10/31/2022 04:30 PM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Received 6 paper copies of Answering Brief [ # 17 ] filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. [12616689] (SD) [Entered: 12/22/2022 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Received 3 paper copies of supplemental excerpts of record [ # 18 ] in 4 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. [12616684] (SD) [Entered: 12/22/2022 02:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Filed clerk order: The answering brief [ # 17 ] submitted by U.S. Bank, N.A. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The supplemental excerpts of record [ # 18 ] submitted by U.S. Bank, N.A. are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12615638] (KWG) [Entered: 12/21/2022 11:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Docket(#20) Added Attorney(s) Ariel Edward Stern for party(s) Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A., in case 22-16682. [12615503] (QDL) [Entered: 12/21/2022 09:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Docket(#19) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ariel E. Stern (Akerman, LLP, 1635 Village Center Circle, Suite 200, Las Vegas, Nevada 89134) for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 12/21/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12615500] [22-16682] (Stern, Ariel) [Entered: 12/21/2022 09:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 12/20/2022. [12615323] [22-16682] (Lachman, Scott) [Entered: 12/20/2022 07:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 12/20/2022. [12615322] [22-16682] (Lachman, Scott) [Entered: 12/20/2022 07:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA and RICHARD R. CLIFTON) In light of appellees representation at Docket Entry No. [ # 13 ] that it will sua sponte postpone the sale should a ruling not be issued prior to the scheduled sale date, appellants motion to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]) is denied as moot. The court has received appellants motion for an injunction pending appeal, which seeks relief on or before January 30, 2023. Any response to the motion remains due December 27, 2022. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. The Clerk will place this appeal on the next available calendar after the completion of briefing. See 9th Cir. Gen. Order 3.3(f). [12614896] (JMR) [Entered: 12/20/2022 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Corrected Motion for injunction pending appeal. Date of service: 12/16/2022. [12613140] [22-16682] (Hanks, Karen) [Entered: 12/16/2022 06:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 12/16/2022. [12613017] [22-16682] (Hanks, Karen) [Entered: 12/16/2022 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 6 ] filed by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. [12600204] (SD) [Entered: 12/01/2022 01:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 7 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. [12600194] (SD) [Entered: 12/01/2022 01:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 6 ] submitted by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 7 ] submitted by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12595604] (KWG) [Entered: 11/25/2022 09:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Date of service: 11/22/2022. [12593948] [22-16682]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of the excerpts. 11/25/2022 by KWG] (Hanks, Karen) [Entered: 11/22/2022 11:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Date of service: 11/22/2022. [12593945] [22-16682]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of the brief. 11/25/2022 by KWG] (Hanks, Karen) [Entered: 11/22/2022 11:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/30/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12588483] (VS) [Entered: 11/16/2022 09:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/03/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12580046]. [22-16682] (AD) [Entered: 11/03/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/03/2022. [12579934] [22-16682] (Hanks, Karen) [Entered: 11/03/2022 04:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed October 26, 2022 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due no later than November 23, 2022; the answering brief is due December 21, 2022 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12577293] (JMR) [Entered: 10/31/2022 04:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. [12575444] (JBS) [Entered: 10/28/2022 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less