This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:13 (UTC).

U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Grant

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 U S Bank, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Grant. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2159

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

Andrew D. Grant

West Hartford, CT 06127

Plaintiff / Appellee

U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Andrew D. Grant

P.O. Box 27-1678

West Hartford, CT 06127

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

William R. Dziedzic Esq.

Attorney at Bendett & McHugh, P.C.

160 Farmington Avenue

Farmington, CT 06032

Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker Esq.

Attorney at Bendett & McHugh, P.C.

270 Farmington Avenue

Farmington, CT 06032

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion for in forma pauperis, motion for stay, [28],[28], on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED.[2652037] [19-2159] [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:51 PM]

#26

(#26) PAPERS, copy of docket sheets, copy of fax confirmation filings to Superior Court of New Britain, RECEIVED.[2638715] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:15 AM]

#24

(#24) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED. Service date 08/20/2019 by US mail.[2638677] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:51 AM]

#23

(#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Andrew D. Grant, FILED. Service date 08/20/2019 by US mail.[2638675] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:50 AM]

#22

(#22) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion for in forma pauperis, [20], on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant,, FILED.[2627461] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:17 PM]

#21

(#21) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/07/2019, denying IFP, RECEIVED.[2627450] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:13 PM]

#16

(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [15], on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED.[2620737] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:13 PM]

8 #5

Supporting Document

8 #2

Supporting Document

8 #1

Motion FILED

#6

(#7) ATTORNEY, Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney William R. Dziedzic, SUBSTITUTED.[2615929] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:00 AM]

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2611137] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/17/2019 05:03 PM]

#3

(#3) NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, SENT.[2611118] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:45 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/12/2019, RECEIVED.[2611117] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:43 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion for in forma pauperis, motion for stay, [28],[28], on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED.[2652037] [19-2159] [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • (#28) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED. Service date 08/29/2019 by US mail.[2652034] [19-2159] [Entered: 09/10/2019 05:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND FORM D-P, [ # 23 ], [ # 24 ], on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED.[2638680] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) PAPERS, copy of docket sheets, copy of fax confirmation filings to Superior Court of New Britain, RECEIVED.[2638715] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED. Service date 08/20/2019 by US mail.[2638677] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Andrew D. Grant, FILED. Service date 08/20/2019 by US mail.[2638675] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/22/2019 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion for in forma pauperis, [20], on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant,, FILED.[2627461] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/07/2019, denying IFP, RECEIVED.[2627450] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#20) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2627434] [19-2159] [Entered: 08/08/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [15], on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED.[2620737] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#15) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED. Service date 07/25/2019 by US mail.[2620734] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Andrew D. Grant, FILED. Service date 07/25/2019 by US mail.[2620672] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2615981] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY, Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney William R. Dziedzic, SUBSTITUTED.[2615929] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2615841] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/24/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2611137] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/17/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, SENT.[2611118] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2612043] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/12/2019, RECEIVED.[2611117] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Andrew D. Grant, FILED. [2611109] [19-2159] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less