This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/30/2019 at 06:40:02 (UTC).

URS Federal Services, Inc. v. OSHA

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 URS Federal Services, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against OSHA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2464

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

URS FEDERAL SERVICES, INC.

Respondents

EUGENE SCALIA, Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Alana F. Genderson

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2541

Jason S. Mills

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

300 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorneys

Daniel J. Chasek

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

350 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Llewlyn D. Robinson

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

350 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Luis A. Garcia

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

350 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nisha Parekh

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

350 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Charles F. James

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Frances Perkins Building, 200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210-0000

John Xavier Cerveny

Attorney at U. S. OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY & HEALTH REVIEW COMMISSION

1120 20Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Kate S. O'Scannlain

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Frances Perkins Building, 200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210-0000

Heather R. Phillips

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

Frances Perkins Building, 200 Constitution Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20210-0000

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alana Genderson for URS Federal Services, Inc.. [1000651939] [19-2464] Alana Genderson [Entered: 12/26/2019 05:16 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by URS Federal Services, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000651938] [19-2464] Jason Mills [Entered: 12/26/2019 05:14 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason S. Mills for URS Federal Services, Inc.. [1000651936] [19-2464] Jason Mills [Entered: 12/26/2019 05:13 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from OSHA. Date petition for review or application filed: 12/19/2019. [ # 3 ] petition for review. Mailed to: J. Cerveny, D. Chasek, L. Garcia, K. O'Scannlain, N. Parekh, L. Robinson. Administrative Record due 01/29/2020 [19-2464] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:25 PM]

#4

(#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Mailed to: J. Cerveny, D. Chasek, L. Garcia, K. O'Scannlain, N. Parekh, L. Robinson. [19-2464] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:21 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Case manager: CPoulsen. [19-2464] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:07 PM]

3 #4

Certificate of Service

#3

Exhibit B

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #1

Petition for review of agency order filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Alana Genderson for URS Federal Services, Inc.. [1000651939] [19-2464] Alana Genderson [Entered: 12/26/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by URS Federal Services, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000651938] [19-2464] Jason Mills [Entered: 12/26/2019 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jason S. Mills for URS Federal Services, Inc.. [1000651936] [19-2464] Jason Mills [Entered: 12/26/2019 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE ISSUED serving respondent and requesting record from OSHA. Date petition for review or application filed: 12/19/2019. [ # 3 ] petition for review. Mailed to: J. Cerveny, D. Chasek, L. Garcia, K. O'Scannlain, N. Parekh, L. Robinson. Administrative Record due 01/29/2020 [19-2464] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Mailed to: J. Cerveny, D. Chasek, L. Garcia, K. O'Scannlain, N. Parekh, L. Robinson. [19-2464] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • (#2) Electronic filing fee paid. Filing Fee:$500.00 Receipt Number:A04-68533-154. [19-2464] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Case manager: CPoulsen. [19-2464] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Petition for review of agency order filed by URS Federal Services, Inc. .[1000649646] [19-2464] CP [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eugene Scalia, Secretary, US Department of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases where URS Federal Services is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant