This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:53 (UTC).

Urquiza v. Allbaugh

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Urquiza filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Allbaugh. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5066

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

ALEJANDRO URQUIZA

Respondent / Appellee

JOE ALLBAUGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Stanley D. Monroe

Attorney at Monroe & Keele

15 West 6Th Street, Suite 2112

Tulsa, OK 74119

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Jennifer B. Miller

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma

313 Ne 21St Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Errata Sheet

Open Document

[10678056] Errata sheet filed by Alejandro Urquiza to Appellant's Motion for Certificate of Appealability. 0 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:02 PM]

Open Document

[10665662] Docketing statement filed by Alejandro Urquiza. Served on 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:19 AM]

Open Document

[10663717] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Jennifer B. Miller for Mr. Joe Allbaugh. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] [Entered: 07/17/2019 12:42 PM]

Open Document #1

Application for Certificate of Appealability

Open Document

[10676626] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Alejandro Urquiza. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/06/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 09/06/2019 01:41 PM]

Open Document

[10665571] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Alejandro Urquiza. Served on: 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] --[Edited 07/25/2019 by SLS to correct docket event and text.] SDM [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:31 AM]

Open Document

[10677056] Notice of appellant's deficient motion for certificate of appealability and appendix received from Alejandro Urquiza. See attached letter for specifics. Errata sheet and corrected appendix due on 09/19/2019 for Alejandro Urquiza. [19-5066] [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:30 PM]

Open Document #2

Appellants Appendix Volume 2

Open Document #3

New General Dkt Letter With Counsel

Open Document #1

Appellants Appendix Volume 1

Open Document #1

Transmittal letter

Open Document

[10665903] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/25/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/03/2019 for Alejandro Urquiza. [19-5066] [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:53 PM]

Open Document

[10665001] Entry of appearance filed by Stanley D. Monroe for Alejandro Urquiza. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/23/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5066] [Entered: 07/23/2019 08:59 AM]

Open Document #2

Preliminary Record

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10678086] Appellant's appendix filed by Alejandro Urquiza. Total number of volumes filed: 2. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10678056] Errata sheet filed by Alejandro Urquiza to Appellant's Motion for Certificate of Appealability. 0 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10677056] Notice of appellant's deficient motion for certificate of appealability and appendix received from Alejandro Urquiza. See attached letter for specifics. Errata sheet and corrected appendix due on 09/19/2019 for Alejandro Urquiza. [19-5066] [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket. [JMN PDF removed a corrected electronic appendix was filed on 9/12/19.] [10676631] Appellant's appendix filed by Alejandro Urquiza. Total number of volumes filed: 2. Served on 09/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 09/06/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10676626] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Alejandro Urquiza. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 09/06/2019 by email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 09/06/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10676624] Motion filed by Appellant Alejandro Urquiza for issuance of certificate of appealability.. Served on: 09/06/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5066]--[Edited 09/12/2019 by JM corrected via errata sheet filed on 9/12/19.] SDM [Entered: 09/06/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665903] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/25/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/03/2019 for Alejandro Urquiza. [19-5066] [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665662] Docketing statement filed by Alejandro Urquiza. Served on 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • [10665577] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/01/2019 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-5066] [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665571] Notice that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal filed by Alejandro Urquiza. Served on: 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] --[Edited 07/25/2019 by SLS to correct docket event and text.] SDM [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665001] Entry of appearance filed by Stanley D. Monroe for Alejandro Urquiza. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/23/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5066] [Entered: 07/23/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • [10664974] Entry of appearance submitted by Stanley D. Monroe for Appellant Alejandro Urquiza for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] --[Edited 07/23/2019 by DD. Removed PDF as pleading filed 7/23/19] SDM [Entered: 07/23/2019 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket because it does not include the certificate of interested parties. Counsel instructed to correct and resubmit. [SLS] [10664687] Entry of appearance submitted by Stanley D. Monroe for Appellant Alejandro Urquiza for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] SDM [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663717] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Jennifer B. Miller for Mr. Joe Allbaugh. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] [Entered: 07/17/2019 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • [10663713] Entry of appearance submitted by Jennifer B. Miller for Appellee Mr. Joe Allbaugh for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/17/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5066] --[Edited 07/17/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JBM [Entered: 07/17/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663273] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/15/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and notice of appearance due 07/30/2019 for Alejandro Urquiza. Notice of appearance also due on 07/30/2019 for Joe Allbaugh. [19-5066] [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.