This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/26/2020 at 05:13:59 (UTC).

Urban Air Initiative, Inc., et al v. EPA

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Urban Air Initiative, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against EPA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1501

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

South Dakota Farmers Union

Clean Fuels Development Coalition

Jackson Express, Inc.

Big River Resources, LLC.

Farmers Union Enterprises, Inc.

The Farmers' Educational & Cooperative Union of America, d/b/a National Farmers Union

Urban Air Initiative, Inc.

Glacial Lakes Energy, LLC.

Little Sioux Corn Processors, LLC

Jump Start Stores, Inc.

Fagen, Inc.

Respondent

Environmental Protection Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

C. Boyden Gray

Attorney at Boyden Gray & Associates, PLLC

801 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 350

Washington, DC 20006

Jonathan Andrew Berry

Attorney at Boyden Gray & Associates, PLLC

801 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 350

Washington, DC 20006

James Conde Esquire

Attorney at Boyden Gray & Associates, PLLC

801 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 350

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1876792] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/21/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 01/21/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/21/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 01/21/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 01/21/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 01/21/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 02/05/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 01/21/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 01/21/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 02/05/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 02/05/2021 [20-1501] [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1876791] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1876788-2 ] [20-1501] [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1876788] of a decision by federal agency filed by Big River Resources, LLC., Clean Fuels Development Coalition, Fagen, Inc., Farmers Union Enterprises, Inc., Glacial Lakes Energy, LLC., Jackson Express, Inc., Jump Start Stores, Inc., Little Sioux Corn Processors, LLC, South Dakota Farmers Union, The Farmers' Educational & Cooperative Union of America and Urban Air Initiative, Inc. [Service Date: 12/16/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [20-1501] [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1501] [Entered: 12/22/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Big River Resources, LLC. is a litigant