This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/25/2022 at 06:02:26 (UTC).

Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, et al v. Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe

Case Summary

On 11/26/2021 Upper Skagit Indian Tribe filed an Other lawsuit against Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-35985

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

SWINOMISH INDIAN TRIBAL COMMUNITY

Not Classified By Court and Appellees

PUYALLUP TRIBE OF INDIANS

STATE OF WASHINGTON

TULALIP TRIBES

PORT GAMBLE S'KLALLAM TRIBE

JAMESTOWN S'KLALLAM TRIBE

SKOKOMISH INDIAN TRIBE

SQUAXIN ISLAND TRIBE

HOH INDIAN TRIBE

Plaintiff / Appellee

UPPER SKAGIT INDIAN TRIBE

Defendant / Appellant

SAUK-SUIATTLE INDIAN TRIBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Hutchinson Haley

Attorney at Office of the Tribal Attorney

11404 Moorage Way

La Conner, WA 98257-0817

James M. Jannetta

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE TRIBAL ATTORNEY

P.O. Box 817

La Conner, WA 98257-0817

Appellee Attorneys

Samuel Judge Stiltner

Attorney at Puyallup Tribe of Indians

3009 E. Portland Avenue

Tacoma, WA 98404

Alec Wrolson

Attorney at Puyallup Tribe of Indians

3009 E. Portland Avenue

Tacoma, WA 98404

Lois Boome

Attorney at Puyallup Tribe of Indians

3009 E. Portland Avenue

Tacoma, WA 98404

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kristin E. Ballinger

999 Third Avenue, Suite 4400

Seattle, WA 98104

Tyler Lawrence Farmer

Attorney at Harrigan Leyh Farmer & Thomsen, LLP

999 Third Avenue, Suite 4400

Seattle, WA 98104

Arthur W. Harrigan Jr.

Attorney at Harrigan Leyh Farmer & Thomsen, LLP

999 Third Avenue, Suite 4400

Seattle, WA 98104

David Stoller Hawkins

Attorney at UPPER SKAGIT INDIAN TRIBE

25944 Community Plaza Way

Sedro Wooley, WA 98284

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Talis Merle Abolins

Attorney at Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

1325 4Th Avenue, Suite 1730

Seattle, WA 98101

Benjamin Alexander Christian

Attorney at Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

1605 Main Street, Suite 710

Sarasota, FL 34236

Jennifer Maglio

Attorney at Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

1605 Main Street, Suite 710

Sarasota, FL 34236

Kehl Van Winkle

Attorney at Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

1605 Main Street, Suite 710

Sarasota, FL 34236

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/03/2021. [12305487] [21-35985] (Abolins, Talis) [Entered: 12/03/2021 03:58 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [12306666] (LW) [Entered: 12/06/2021 12:16 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe opening brief due 02/28/2022. Appellees Puyallup Tribe of Indians, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community and Upper Skagit Indian Tribe answering brief due 03/30/2022. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12346539] (JN) [Entered: 01/20/2022 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe. New requested due date is 02/28/2022. [12346256] [21-35985] (Maglio, Jennifer) [Entered: 01/20/2022 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#6) Terminated Kristin E. Ballinger for Upper Skagit Indian Tribe in 21-35985 [12330753] (NAC) [Entered: 01/04/2022 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Kristin E. Ballinger for Appellee Upper Skagit Indian Tribe. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 01/04/2022. [12330655] [21-35985] (Harrigan, Arthur) [Entered: 01/04/2022 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. [12306666] (LW) [Entered: 12/06/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/03/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12305697]. [21-35985] (AD) [Entered: 12/03/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/03/2021. [12305487] [21-35985] (Abolins, Talis) [Entered: 12/03/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/03/2021. Appellant Sauk-Suiattle Indian Tribe opening brief due 01/28/2022. Appellees Swinomish Indian Tribal Community and Upper Skagit Indian Tribe answering brief due 02/28/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12298796] (RT) [Entered: 11/26/2021 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swinomish Indian Tribal Community is a litigant

Latest cases where Puyallup Tribe of Indians is a litigant