This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/02/2021 at 06:13:28 (UTC).

Upaid Systems, Ltd. v. Card Concepts, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Upaid Systems, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Card Concepts, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1910

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

CARD CONCEPTS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

UPAID SYSTEMS, LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Douglas L. Sawyer

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Tara Lauren Kurtis

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

131 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Mark T. Smith

Attorney at Perkins Coie, LLP

131 South Dearborn, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60603

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew R. Frontz

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Henry A. Petri Jr.

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1401 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION of Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd. to extend the time to 07/16/2021 to file brief. Service: 06/23/2021 by email. [782082] [21-1910] [Henry Petri] [Entered: 06/23/2021 04:09 PM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775515] [21-1910] [Henry Petri] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:24 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775514] [21-1910] [Henry Petri] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:23 PM]

#5

(#5) Entry of appearance for Henry A. Petri, Jr.; Matthew R. Frontz as counsel for Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775513] [21-1910] [Henry Petri] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:21 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Card Concepts, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775439] [21-1910] [Tara Kurtis] [Entered: 05/17/2021 03:00 PM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Card Concepts, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775437] [21-1910] [Tara Kurtis] [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:58 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Douglas L. Sawyer; Mark T. Smith; Tara L. Kurtis as counsel for Appellee Card Concepts, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775433] [21-1910] [Tara Kurtis] [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:55 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 8 ], ERROR: The caption provided on the document does not follow the official caption provided by the Clerk. CORRECTION: For future filings, please refer to Docket Entry #1 for the official caption. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [782244] [EKD] [Entered: 06/24/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 8 ] filed by Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd. The opening brief is due 07/16/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [782243] [EKD] [Entered: 06/24/2021 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION of Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd. to extend the time to 07/16/2021 to file brief. Service: 06/23/2021 by email. [782082] [21-1910] [Henry Petri] [Entered: 06/23/2021 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775515] [21-1910] [Henry Petri] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775514] [21-1910] [Henry Petri] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Henry A. Petri, Jr.; Matthew R. Frontz as counsel for Appellant Upaid Systems, Ltd.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775513] [21-1910] [Henry Petri] [Entered: 05/17/2021 07:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Card Concepts, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775439] [21-1910] [Tara Kurtis] [Entered: 05/17/2021 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Card Concepts, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775437] [21-1910] [Tara Kurtis] [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Douglas L. Sawyer; Mark T. Smith; Tara L. Kurtis as counsel for Appellee Card Concepts, Inc.. Service: 05/17/2021 by email. [775433] [21-1910] [Tara Kurtis] [Entered: 05/17/2021 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/28/2021. [772448] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/17/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/17/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 05/17/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 07/02/2021. [EKD] [Entered: 05/03/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Upaid Systems, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew R. Frontz