This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/08/2019 at 06:11:16 (UTC).

Universal Stabilization Tech. v. Advanced BioNutrition Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Universal Stabilization Tech filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Advanced BioNutrition Corp. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1380

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

UNIVERSAL STABILIZATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Delaware corporation

Defendant / Cross Appellant

ADVANCED BIONUTRITION CORP., a Maryland corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Benjamin Wagner Esq.

Attorney at Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.

3580 Carmel Mountain Road, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant / Cross Appellant Attorneys

Andrew J. Koopman

Attorney at RatnerPrestia

2200 Renaissance Boulevard

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

Benjamin E. Leace

Attorney at RatnerPrestia

2200 Renaissance Boulevard

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

Christopher H. Blaszkowski

Attorney at RatnerPrestia

2200 Renaissance Boulevard

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 582246-2 ] in 18-2413; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [582856] [18-2413, 19-1380] [MMA] [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:48 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed. The appeals are consolidated, and the motion [ # 6 ] is granted. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The appellant's opening brief remains due March 25, 2019. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [580918] [18-2413, 19-1380] [LS] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:07 AM]

6 #2

Declaration of Benjamin E. Leace

6 #1

Unopposed Motion for a 59-day Extension of Time

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578156] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:39 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Christopher H. Blaszkowski as of counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578155] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:38 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Andrew J. Koopman as of counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578153] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:34 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Benjamin E. Leace as principal counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578151] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:32 PM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 582246-2 ] in 18-2413; issuing mandate. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [582856] [18-2413, 19-1380] [MMA] [Entered: 02/01/2019 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • (#8) Note to file: The following cases are associated:18-2413 Lead with 19-1380 Cross-Appeal. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [580923] [18-2413, 19-1380] [MMA] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed. The appeals are consolidated, and the motion [ # 6 ] is granted. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. The appellant's opening brief remains due March 25, 2019. Service: 01/25/2019 by clerk. [580918] [18-2413, 19-1380] [LS] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION of Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp. to extend the time to 05/06/2019 to file the Appellant's Opening Brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578163] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578156] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Entry of appearance for Christopher H. Blaszkowski as of counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578155] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Andrew J. Koopman as of counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578153] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Benjamin E. Leace as principal counsel for Appellant Advanced BioNutrition Corp.. Service: 01/15/2019 by email. [578151] [19-1380] [Benjamin Leace] [Entered: 01/15/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/20/2018. [576448] Entry of Appearance due 01/22/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 01/22/2019. Docketing Statement due 01/22/2019. Appellant's brief is due 03/08/2019. [MMA] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJAMIN E. LEACE(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher H. Blaszkowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew John Koopman