This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/14/2021 at 05:13:31 (UTC).

Universal Electronics, Inc. v. Roku, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Universal Electronics, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Roku, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2128

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

UNIVERSAL ELECTRONICS, INC.

Appellee

ROKU, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

James J. Lukas Jr.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A

77 West Wacker Drivesuite 3100

Chicago, IL 33166

Appellee Attorney

David W. O'Brien

Attorney at Haynes & Boone

600 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 07/09/2021. [785482] Entry of Appearance is due on 07/26/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/26/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 07/26/2021. Certified List is due on 08/23/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 07/12/2021 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Electronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Roku, Inc. is a litigant