This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/27/2019 at 06:03:32 (UTC).

Univ Life Church Monastery, et al v. Wayne Nabors, et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Univ Life Church Monastery filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wayne Nabors. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6217

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant

WAYNE NABORS

Defendant / Appellants

NEAL PINKSTON, in his official capacity as District Attorney General for Hamilton County

HERBERT H. SLATERY, III, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Tennessee

BILL LEE, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Tennessee

JENNINGS H. JONES, in his official capacity as District Attorney General for Rutherford County

BRYANT C. DUNAWAY, in his official capacity as District Attorney General for Putnam County

KIM R. HELPER, in her official capacity as District Attorney General for Rutherford County

Plaintiff / Appellees

GALE PLUMM, a married couple

TIMEAKA FARRIS, a married couple

JAMES WELCH, an individual

Cookeville, TN 38501

ERIN PATTERSON, an individual

GABRIEL BISER, an individual

UNIVERSAL LIFE CHURCH MONASTERY STOREHOUSE, a Washington non-profit corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jonathan David Shaub

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Leslie Ann Bridges

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ambika K. Doran

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Lucian T. Pera

Attorney at Adams & Reese

6075 Poplar Avenue, Suite 700

Memphis, TN 38119

Rocklan W. King III

Attorney at Adams & Reese

424 Church Street, Suite 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

Bruce Edward Johnson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Robert Edward Miller

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine

920 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

James Welch

4837 Shipley Road

Cookeville, TN 38501

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

23 #2

Declaration of Ambika Doran

23 #1

motion

#22

21 #2

judge order filed

21 #1

Cover Letter

#14

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RULING LETTER SENT granting motion extend time to file a response to motion to dismiss or remand appeal by four (4) days [ # 26 ] filed by Mr. Jonathan David Shaub. The response is now due: January 7, 2020. (SSS) [Entered: 12/26/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION filed by Mr. Jonathan David Shaub for Bryant C. Dunaway, Kim R. Helper, Jennings H. Jones, Bill Lee, Neal Pinkston and Herbert H. Slatery, III to extend time to respond to motion to dismiss or remand Certificate of Service: 12/26/2019. [19-6217] (JDS) [Entered: 12/26/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RULING LETTER SENT declaring as moot motion to extend time to file brief [ # 24 ] filed by Mr. Rocklan W. King, III,. The briefing schedule issued November 13, 2019 is cancelled pending a ruling on the motion to remand filed 12/24/2019. When this outstanding matter has been resolved, the clerk's office will issue a new briefing schedule or give the parties other instructions. (SSS) [Entered: 12/26/2019 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION filed by Mr. Rocklan W. King, III for Gabriel Biser, Timeaka Farris, Erin Patterson, Gale Plumm and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 12/24/2019. [19-6217] (RWK) [Entered: 12/24/2019 09:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION filed by Mr. Rocklan W. King, III for Gabriel Biser, Timeaka Farris, Erin Patterson, Gale Plumm and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction, to remand. Certificate of Service: 12/24/2019. [19-6217] (RWK) [Entered: 12/24/2019 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Jonathan David Shaub for Bryant C. Dunaway, Kim R. Helper, Jennings H. Jones, Bill Lee, Neal Pinkston and Herbert H. Slatery, III Certificate of Service:12/23/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-6217] (JDS) [Entered: 12/23/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER filed the motion stay district court proceeding [ # 14 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. Richard F. Suhrheinrich, Circuit Judge; Deborah L. Cook, Circuit Judge and Chad A. Readler, Circuit Judge. (RB) [Entered: 12/09/2019 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion stay district court proceeding, [ # 14 ]; previously filed by Mr. Jonathan David Shaub for Herbert H. Slatery, III, Jennings H. Jones, Neal Pinkston, Bryant C. Dunaway, Kim R. Helper and Bill Lee. Response from Attorney Mr. Rocklan W. King, III for Appellees Gabriel Biser, Timeaka Farris, Erin Patterson, Gale Plumm and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse Certificate of Service:12/06/2019. [19-6217] (RWK) [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Copy of District Court Order filed 12/06/2019. This case is hereby STAYED pending resolution of the state Defendants' appeal. As a consequence, the pretrial conference scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on December 9, 2019, and the bench trial scheduled for December 19, 2019 are hereby CANCELLED, to be reset as soon as possible after the Sixth Circuit issues a ruling. (SSS) [Entered: 12/06/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Gabriel Biser, Timeaka Farris, Erin Patterson, Gale Plumm and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse by Robert E. Miller. Certificate of Service: 12/05/2019. [19-6217] (REM) [Entered: 12/05/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jonathan David Shaub for Appellants Bryant C. Dunaway, Kim R. Helper, Jennings H. Jones, Bill Lee, Neal Pinkston and Herbert H. Slatery, III. Certificate of Service:11/12/2019. [19-6217] (JDS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Jonathan David Shaub for Bryant C. Dunaway, Kim R. Helper, Jennings H. Jones, Bill Lee, Neal Pinkston and Herbert H. Slatery, III. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2019. [19-6217] (JDS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Bryant C. Dunaway, Jennings H. Jones, Kim R. Helper, Bill Lee, Neal Pinkston and Herbert H. Slatery, III by Jonathan David Shaub. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2019. [19-6217] (JDS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Ambika K. Doran for Appellees Gabriel Biser, Timeaka Farris, Erin Patterson, Gale Plumm and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse Certificate of Service: 11/11/2019. [19-6217] (AKD) [Entered: 11/11/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Gabriel Biser, Timeaka Farris, Erin Patterson, Gale Plumm and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse by Ambika K. Doran. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2019. [19-6217] (AKD) [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Gabriel Biser, Timeaka Farris, Erin Patterson, Gale Plumm and Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse by BRUCE E. H. JOHNSON. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2019. [19-6217] (BEJ) [Entered: 11/08/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **LOCKED**APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse, Mr. James Welch, Erin Patterson and Gabriel Biser by Ambika K. Doran. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2019. [19-6217]-Counsel instructed to refile; Appellee parties listed on the appearance form and in the docket text should match.--[Edited 11/08/2019 by SSS] (AKD) [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **LOCKED**APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Gabriel Biser, Timeaka Farris, Erin Patterson, Gale Plumm, Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse and Mr. James Welch by Bruce E. H. Johnson. Certificate of Service: 11/08/2019. [19-6217]-Counsel instructed to refile selecting all Appellee parties on appearance form and in the docket text.--[Edited 11/08/2019 by SSS] (BEJ) [Entered: 11/08/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Herbert H. Slatery, III., Jennings H. Jones, Neal Pinkston, Bryant C. Dunaway, Kim R. Helper and Bill Lee. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 10/28/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Universal Life Church Monastery Storehouse Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce Edward Johnson