This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2021 at 06:11:48 (UTC).

United Therapeutics Corp. v. HHS, et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 United Therapeutics Corp filed an Other lawsuit against HHS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5328

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

United Therapeutics Corporation

Defendant / Appellants

United States Food and Drug Administration

Stephen M. Hahn, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Food and Drugs, Food and Drug Administration

United States Department of Health and Human Services

Alex M. Azar, II, in his official capacity as Secretary of United States Department of Health and Human Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Shaun R. Snader

Attorney at United Therapeutics Corporation

1735 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Second Floor

Washington, DC 20009

Anne Walsh

Attorney at Hyman, Phelps & McNamara, PC

700 13Th Street, Nw, Suite 1200

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Scott R. McIntosh

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Melissa Nicole Patterson

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [20-5328] [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:56 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1875447] filed granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1874254-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [20-5328] [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:54 PM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION [1874254] to dismiss case voluntarily filed by Alex M. Azar, II, FDA, Stephen M. Hahn and HHS [Service Date: 12/03/2020 ] Length Certification: 58 Words. [20-5328] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:43 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1873937] filed by Anne K. Walsh on behalf of Appellee United Therapeutics Corporation. [20-5328] (Walsh, Anne) [Entered: 12/01/2020 08:35 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1870016] filed by Scott R. McIntosh and co-counsel Melissa N. Patterson on behalf of Appellants Alex M. Azar, II, FDA, Stephen M. Hahn and HHS. [20-5328] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 11/06/2020 10:19 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1869731] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/21/2020. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/04/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/04/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/04/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/21/2020 [20-5328] [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:01 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1869725] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-01577-ESH filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Stephen M. Hahn, HHS and FDA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5328. [20-5328] [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:40 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, U.S. District Court. [20-5328] [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1875447] filed granting motion to dismiss case voluntarily [ # 1874254-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandate forthwith to the district court. [20-5328] [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION [1874254] to dismiss case voluntarily filed by Alex M. Azar, II, FDA, Stephen M. Hahn and HHS [Service Date: 12/03/2020 ] Length Certification: 58 Words. [20-5328] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1873937] filed by Anne K. Walsh on behalf of Appellee United Therapeutics Corporation. [20-5328] (Walsh, Anne) [Entered: 12/01/2020 08:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1870016] filed by Scott R. McIntosh and co-counsel Melissa N. Patterson on behalf of Appellants Alex M. Azar, II, FDA, Stephen M. Hahn and HHS. [20-5328] (McIntosh, Scott) [Entered: 11/06/2020 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1869731] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/04/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/21/2020. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/04/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/04/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/04/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/21/2020 [20-5328] [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1869725] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-01577-ESH filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Stephen M. Hahn, HHS and FDA. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5328. [20-5328] [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5328] [Entered: 11/04/2020 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Therapeutics Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa N. Patterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R. McIntosh