This case was last updated from PACER on 05/13/2019 at 06:22:08 (UTC).

United States v. William J. Mooney, et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 United States filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against William J Mooney. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1533

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

Harbor Holdings, Mid-Atlantic Trustees and Administrators

Defendant / Appellants

William J. Mooney

Little Falls, MN 56345

Joni T. Mooney

Little Falls, MN 56345

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

William J. Mooney

409 Sixth Avenue, N.W.

Little Falls, MN 56345

Joni T. Mooney

409 Sixth Avenue, N.W.

Little Falls, MN 56345

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Pahl

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Ben Franklin Station, P.O. Box 7238

Washington, DC 20044-0000

Richard L. Parker

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Ben Franklin Station, P.O. Box 502

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Richard L. Parker for Appellee United States of America w/service 03/22/2019 [4769744] [19-1533] (RLP) [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:54 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Motion for extension

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Joni T. Mooney and William J. Mooney due 04/23/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766848] [19-1533] (CYZ) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:46 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, R&Rs of 5/1/2017, 4/19/2018, 9/28/2018, Orders of 11/7/2016, 1/30/2017, 5/31/2017, 5/15/2018. 2/5/2019, Amended Order of 2/6/2019, Order for Sale of 2/6/2019, Judgment of 5/18/2018, [4766846] [19-1533] (CYZ) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:45 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4779872-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellants Mr. William J. Mooney and Ms. Joni T. Mooney. Brief of Joni T. Mooney and William J. Mooney due 05/14/2019 [4779874] [19-1533] (LMT) [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:18 AM]

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4779872-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellants Mr. William J. Mooney and Ms. Joni T. Mooney. Brief of Joni T. Mooney and William J. Mooney due 05/14/2019 [4779874] [19-1533] (LMT) [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/14/2019, filed by Appellants Ms. Joni T. Mooney and Mr. William J. Mooney w/service 04/22/2019. [4779872] [19-1533] (LMT) [Entered: 04/22/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Richard L. Parker for Appellee United States of America w/service 03/22/2019 [4769744] [19-1533] (RLP) [Entered: 03/22/2019 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: If the original file of the U.S. District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by 8th Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with 8th Circuit Local Rule 30A (a)(2), the clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Joni T. Mooney and William J. Mooney due 04/23/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4766848] [19-1533] (CYZ) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, R&Rs of 5/1/2017, 4/19/2018, 9/28/2018, Orders of 11/7/2016, 1/30/2017, 5/31/2017, 5/15/2018. 2/5/2019, Amended Order of 2/6/2019, Order for Sale of 2/6/2019, Judgment of 5/18/2018, [4766846] [19-1533] (CYZ) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4766819] [19-1533] (CYZ) [Entered: 03/14/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.