This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2021 at 05:15:21 (UTC).

United States v. Ruben Cruz

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 United States filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ruben Cruz. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2788

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Defendant / Appellant

Ruben Joe Cruz

Leavenworth, KS 66048-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew Greenley

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 250, 655 First Avenue, N.

Fargo, ND 58102-4932

Christopher C. Myers

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 250, 655 First Avenue, N.

Fargo, ND 58102-4932

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Christopher P. Bellmore

Attorney at FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

Suite 200, Federal Square, 112 Roberts Street, N.

Fargo, ND 58102-0000

Ruben Joe Cruz

Attorney at U.S. PENITENTIARY

P.O. Box 1000

Leavenworth, KS 66048-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 08/31/2021. Transcript due 08/31/2021. Brief of appellant Ruben Joe Cruz due 09/14/2021. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5064189] [21-2788] (ASL) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5064183] [21-2788] (ASL) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Judgment of 7/27/2021, and docket entries, [5064175] [21-2788] (ASL) [Entered: 08/10/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL case docketed. [5064072] [21-2788] (ASL) [Entered: 08/10/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher P. Bellmore