This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 06:07:06 (UTC).

United States v. Pfeiffer

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 United States filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Pfeiffer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1459

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

DUSTIN PFEIFFER

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Robert L. Sirianni Jr.

Attorney at Brownstone Law

201 North New York Avenue, Suite 200

Winter Park, FL 32789

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jack Edward Burkhead

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Norman Cairns

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

James Robert Wolfgang Braun

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Nicholas J. Ganjei

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10714244] Order filed by Clerk of the Court upon review of the motion for COA and attached brief in support. The motion for COA is accepted for filing, however counsel remains obligated to file a fully compliant opening brief and appendix pursuant to the rules. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 02/06/2020 for Dustin Pfeiffer. The brief comply with the FRAP and 10th Circuit Rules, include a certificate of digital submission, and cite to the appendix. See attached order for details. Served on 01/30/2020. [19-1459] [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:42 AM]

Open Document #3

Order Denying 2255

Open Document #2

Brief in Support of Motion for Certificate of Appealability

Open Document #1

Motion for Certificate of Appealability

Open Document

[10706360] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Nicholas J. Ganjei's motion to substitute attorney. Dustin C. Segovia is substituted by Nicholas J. Ganjei for the appellee. Served on 12/31/2019. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:26 AM]

Open Document

[10706345] Motion filed by Appellee United States of America to substitute attorney Mr. Dustin Segovia for United States of America with attorney Nicholas Jon Ganjei.. Served on: 12/31/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1459] DS [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:09 AM]

Open Document

[10706229] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Nicholas J. Ganjei for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/31/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/31/2019 09:24 AM]

Open Document

[10702787] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert L. Sirianni, Jr. for Dustin Pfeiffer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:30 PM]

Open Document

[10702782] Notice received from Dustin Pfeiffer that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1459] RLS [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:16 PM]

Open Document

[10702755] Docketing statement filed by Dustin Pfeiffer. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] RLS [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:34 AM]

Open Document

[10702699] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Dustin Segovia for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/16/2019 09:30 AM]

Open Document #3

New General Dkt Letter With Counsel

Open Document #2

Civil Docket Sheet

Open Document #1

Preliminary record

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714244] Order filed by Clerk of the Court upon review of the motion for COA and attached brief in support. The motion for COA is accepted for filing, however counsel remains obligated to file a fully compliant opening brief and appendix pursuant to the rules. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 02/06/2020 for Dustin Pfeiffer. The brief comply with the FRAP and 10th Circuit Rules, include a certificate of digital submission, and cite to the appendix. See attached order for details. Served on 01/30/2020. [19-1459] [Entered: 01/30/2020 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10714004] Motion filed by Appellant Dustin Pfeiffer for issuance of certificate of appealability.. Served on: 01/29/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1459] RLS [Entered: 01/29/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10706360] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Attorney Nicholas J. Ganjei's motion to substitute attorney. Dustin C. Segovia is substituted by Nicholas J. Ganjei for the appellee. Served on 12/31/2019. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10706345] Motion filed by Appellee United States of America to substitute attorney Mr. Dustin Segovia for United States of America with attorney Nicholas Jon Ganjei.. Served on: 12/31/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1459] DS [Entered: 12/31/2019 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10706229] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Nicholas J. Ganjei for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/31/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/31/2019 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket[10706210] Entry of appearance submitted by Nicholas Jon Ganjei for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/31/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] --[Edited 12/31/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 12/31/2019.] NJG [Entered: 12/31/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • Docket[10705007] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/24/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 02/03/2020 for Dustin Pfeiffer. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/24/2019 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702787] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Robert L. Sirianni, Jr. for Dustin Pfeiffer. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702783] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/23/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1459] [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702782] Notice received from Dustin Pfeiffer that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1459] RLS [Entered: 12/16/2019 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702755] Docketing statement filed by Dustin Pfeiffer. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] RLS [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702753] Entry of appearance submitted by ROBERT L. SIRIANNI, JR. for Appellant Dustin Pfeiffer for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 12/16/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 12/16/2019.] [19-1459] RLS [Entered: 12/16/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702699] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Dustin Segovia for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/16/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702680] Entry of appearance submitted by Dustin C. Segovia for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1459] --[Edited 12/16/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 12/16/2019.] DS [Entered: 12/16/2019 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10700110] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/05/2019. Docketing statement due 12/19/2019 for Dustin Pfeiffer. Transcript order form due 12/19/2019 for Dustin Pfeiffer. Notice of appearance due on 12/19/2019 for Dustin Pfeiffer and United States of America. [19-1459] [Entered: 12/05/2019 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.