This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2021 at 05:10:22 (UTC).

United States v. Paul Winnick

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 United States filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Paul Winnick. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2718

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Defendant / Appellant

Paul Joseph Winnick

Rush City, MN 55069-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Craig Raymond Baune

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

600 U.S. Courthouse, 300 S. Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415-0000

Miranda Dugi

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

600 U.S. Courthouse, 300 S. Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James S. Becker

Attorney at FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

107 U.S. Courthouse, 300 S. Fourth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55415-0000

Paul Joseph Winnick

Attorney at MINNESOTA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

7600 525Th Street

Rush City, MN 55069-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by James S. Becker for Appellant Mr. Paul Joseph Winnick w/service 08/02/2021 [5061045] [21-2718] (JSB) [Entered: 08/02/2021 01:26 PM]

Open Document

CRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 08/23/2021. Transcript due 08/23/2021. Brief of appellant Paul Joseph Winnick due 09/07/2021. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5060996] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:17 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:This criminal appeal involves child pornography. In accordance with the provisions of 18 U.S.C. Section 3509(d)(2) regarding confidentiality of information and privacy protection, all papers filed with this court which disclose the name of or any information concerning a child shall be sealed. (SEE order for complete details) [5060990] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:05 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5060987] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:00 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Amended Judgment 7/22/21 [5060983] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:59 AM]

Open Document

CRIMINAL case docketed. [5060970] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:53 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketRECORD FILED - SEALED PSI REPORT, 1 volumes, Comments: 1 volume, 3 copies of Sealed PSI Report, Addendums, and Statement of Reasons, Source Location: USDC / MN [5061741] [21-2718] (STL) [Entered: 08/03/2021 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by James S. Becker for Appellant Mr. Paul Joseph Winnick w/service 08/02/2021 [5061045] [21-2718] (JSB) [Entered: 08/02/2021 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 08/23/2021. Transcript due 08/23/2021. Brief of appellant Paul Joseph Winnick due 09/07/2021. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5060996] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:This criminal appeal involves child pornography. In accordance with the provisions of 18 U.S.C. Section 3509(d)(2) regarding confidentiality of information and privacy protection, all papers filed with this court which disclose the name of or any information concerning a child shall be sealed. (SEE order for complete details) [5060990] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5060987] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Amended Judgment 7/22/21 [5060983] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL case docketed. [5060970] [21-2718] (MMH) [Entered: 08/02/2021 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less