This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2020 at 05:20:20 (UTC).

United States v. Kendall Streb

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 United States filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Kendall Streb. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3028

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

Kendall Streb

Des Moines, IA 50313

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Alfredo G. Parrish

Attorney at PARRISH & KRUIDENIER

2910 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50312

Kendall Streb

Attorney at POLK COUNTY JAIL

1985 N.E. 51St Place

Des Moines, IA 50313

Gina Messamer

Attorney at PARRISH & KRUIDENIER

2910 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50312

Jessica Donels

Attorney at PARRISH & KRUIDENIER

2910 Grand Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50312

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kristin Herrera

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

286 U.S. Courthouse Annex, 110 E. Court Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309-2053

Virginia Bruner

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

286 U.S. Courthouse Annex, 110 E. Court Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309-2053

Craig Peyton Gaumer

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

286 U.S. Courthouse Annex, 110 E. Court Avenue

Des Moines, IA 50309-2053

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Gina Messamer for Appellant Mr. Kendall Streb w/service 09/30/2020 [4961221] [20-3028] (GM) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Alfredo Parrish for Appellant Mr. Kendall Streb w/service 09/30/2020 [4961219] [20-3028] (AGP) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:15 PM]

Open Document

CRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on 11/09/2020. PSI due 11/09/2020. Brief of appellant due on 11/23/2020. Appellee(s) brief due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Reply brief due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief.[4961129] [20-3028] (CMH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:35 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:This criminal appeal involves a child victim or child witness. In accordance with the provisions of 18 U.S.C. Section 3509(d)(2) regarding confidentiality of information and privacy protection, all papers filed with this court which disclose the name of or any information concerning a child shall be sealed. (SEE order for complete details) [4961122] [20-3028] (CMH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:16 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment dated 9/24/2020. [4961115] [20-3028] (CMH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:01 PM]

Open Document

CRIMINAL case docketed. [4961109] [20-3028] (CMH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:44 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Gina Messamer for Appellant Mr. Kendall Streb w/service 09/30/2020 [4961221] [20-3028] (GM) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Alfredo Parrish for Appellant Mr. Kendall Streb w/service 09/30/2020 [4961219] [20-3028] (AGP) [Entered: 09/30/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on 11/09/2020. PSI due 11/09/2020. Brief of appellant due on 11/23/2020. Appellee(s) brief due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Reply brief due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief.[4961129] [20-3028] (CMH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:This criminal appeal involves a child victim or child witness. In accordance with the provisions of 18 U.S.C. Section 3509(d)(2) regarding confidentiality of information and privacy protection, all papers filed with this court which disclose the name of or any information concerning a child shall be sealed. (SEE order for complete details) [4961122] [20-3028] (CMH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment dated 9/24/2020. [4961115] [20-3028] (CMH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL case docketed. [4961109] [20-3028] (CMH) [Entered: 09/30/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin Herrera

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig P Gaumer