This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/04/2021 at 06:09:58 (UTC).

United States v. Johnson

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 United States filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-4080

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellant

GLENDA JOHNSON

South Jordan, UT 84095

Receiver

R. WAYNE KLEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff Attorneys

Erin Healy Gallagher

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7238, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

Erin R. Hines

Attorney at Department of Justice

555 4Th Street, N.W., P.O. Box 227

Washington, DC 20044-0000

John K. Mangum Jr.

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

111 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Christopher J. Moran

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7238, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Glenda Johnson

P.O. Box 95332

South Jordan, UT 84095

Receiver Attorneys

Jeffery A. Balls

Attorney at Parr Brown Gee & Loveless

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

David C. Castleberry

Attorney at Manning Curtis Bradshaw & Bednar

136 East South Temple, Suite 1300

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jonathan O. Hafen

Attorney at Parr Brown Gee & Loveless

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Michael S. Lehr

Attorney at Parr Brown Gee & Loveless

101 South 200 East, Suite 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Other Attorneys

Neldon P. Johnson

P.O. Box 95332

South Jordan, UT 84095

Justin D. Heideman

Attorney at Heideman, McKay, Heugly & Olsen

2696 North University Avenue, Suite 180

Provo, UT 84604

Steven Richard Paul

Attorney at Nelson, Snuffer, Dahle & Poulsen

10885 South State Street

Sandy, UT 84070-0000

Denver C. Snuffer Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Snuffer, Dahle & Poulsen

10885 South State Street

Sandy, UT 84070-0000

Joshua D. Egan

Attorney at Nelson, Snuffer, Dahle & Poulsen

10885 South State Street

Sandy, UT 84070-0000

Daniel B. Garriott

Attorney at Nelson, Snuffer, Dahle & Poulsen

10885 South State Street

Sandy, UT 84070-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

Exhibits 21-23

Open Document #3

Exhibits 11-20

Open Document #2

Exhibits 1-10

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

Open Document #6

vol 6 pldgs

Open Document #5

vol 5 pldgs

Open Document #4

vol 4 pldgs

Open Document #3

vol 3 pdgs

Open Document #2

vol 2 pldgs

Open Document #1

vol 1 pldgs

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10850778] Appellant brief filed by Glenda Johnson. Served on 08/12/2021 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellee's brief due 09/13/2021 for R. Wayne Klein. [21-4080] [Entered: 08/16/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10846218] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Jeffery A. Balls and Michael S. Lehr for R. Wayne Klein. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (some parties previously disclosed). Served on 07/27/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-4080] [Entered: 07/27/2021 07:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docket[10846178] Entry of appearance submitted by Jeffery A. Balls and Michael S. Lehr for Appellee R. Wayne Klein for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/26/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 07/27/2021 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 07/27/21][21-4080] JAB [Entered: 07/26/2021 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10843880] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 6, Comments: Volumes 1-6 pleadings. [21-4080] [Entered: 07/15/2021 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docket[10842830] Minute order filed - Notice of appearance due on 07/26/2021 for R. Wayne Klein. (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-4080] [Entered: 07/12/2021 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10841802] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 08/16/2021 for Glenda Johnson. Record on appeal due for 10th circuit 07/28/2021. [21-4080] [Entered: 07/07/2021 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10841500] Entry of appearance filed by Glenda Johnson. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/01/2021. Manner of Service: US mail [21-4080] [Entered: 07/06/2021 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10841414] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/06/2021 Notice of appearance due on 08/05/2021 for Glenda Johnson, and Notice of appearance due on 07/20/2021 for United States of America. [21-4080] [Entered: 07/06/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua D. Egan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel B. Garriott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven R. Paul