This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/21/2021 at 05:12:40 (UTC).

United States v. Jewel Spencer

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 United States filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jewel Spencer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2128

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

Jewel Lamont Spencer

Lonoke, AR 72086-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Lisa Peters

Attorney at FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

Suite 490, 1401 W. Capitol

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Sylvia Talley

Attorney at FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

Suite 490, 1401 W. Capitol

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Jewel Lamont Spencer

Attorney at LONOKE COUNTY JAIL

440 Dee Dee Lane

Lonoke, AR 72086-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Michael S. Gordon

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 500, 425 W. Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Sylvia Talley for Appellant Mr. Jewel Lamont Spencer w/service 05/19/2021 [5037412] [21-2128] (ST) [Entered: 05/19/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 06/08/2021. Transcript due 06/08/2021. Brief of appellant Jewel Lamont Spencer due 06/22/2021. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5037198] [21-2128] (CMH) [Entered: 05/19/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5037190] [21-2128] (CMH) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and Judgment filed 5/13/2021. [5037174] [21-2128] (CMH) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL case docketed. [5037161] [21-2128] (CMH) [Entered: 05/19/2021 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Steven Gordon