This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/05/2021 at 05:14:59 (UTC).

United States v. Jason Woodring

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 United States filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jason Woodring. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1499

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

Jason Woodring

Texarkana, TX 75505-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jason Woodring

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P.O. Box 7000

Texarkana, TX 75505-0000

Sylvia Talley

Attorney at FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

Suite 490, 1401 W. Capitol

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Stacey E. McCord

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 500, 425 W. Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

Cameron C. McCree

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 500, 425 W. Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

Michael S. Gordon

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Suite 500, 425 W. Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 03/24/2021. Transcript due 03/24/2021. Brief of appellant Jason Woodring due 04/07/2021. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5010686] [21-1499] (CJO) [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:The Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this case. [5010683] [21-1499] (CJO) [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment 06/19/2015, Final Order of Forfeiture 02/29/2016, and Order 02/11/2021.[5010675] [21-1499] (CJO) [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL case docketed. [5010673] [21-1499] (CJO) [Entered: 03/03/2021 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Charles McCree

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Steven Gordon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacey Elise McCord