This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:48 (UTC).

United States v. Hopper

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 United States filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Hopper. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2110

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

POLLY HOPPER

Fort Worth, TX 76127

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Todd A. Coberly

Attorney at Coberly Law Office

1322 Paseo De Peralta

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Polly Hopper

Attorney at FMC - Carswell

P.O. Box 27137

Fort Worth, TX 76127

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Randy M. Castellano

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

555 South Telshor, Suite 300

Las Cruces, NM 88011

Paige Messec

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

201 3Rd Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter With Counsel

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10665983] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Paige Messec for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] --[Edited 07/26/2019 by AT to add correct entry of appearance form.] [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:13 AM]

Open Document

[10666929] Docketing statement filed by Ms. Polly Hopper. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:31 PM]

Open Document

[10666950] Designation of record filed by Appellant Ms. Polly Hopper. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:00 PM]

Open Document

[10666952] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Todd A. Coberly for Ms. Polly Hopper. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:00 PM]

Open Document

[10666960] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Ms. Polly Hopper. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:09 PM]

Open Document

[10666996] Motion filed by Appellant Ms. Polly Hopper for attorney Todd A. Coberly to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:55 PM]

Open Document

[10677202] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter comes on for consideration on appellant's second motion for appointment of counsel. By order of 8/23/2019, appellant was advised that no action would be taken on the motion for appointment at this time, and that the motion would be referred to the merits panel. Once appellant has filed his opening brief and COA, the court may consider appellant's own statement of the arguments on appeal. The court construes appellant's motion as requesting an extension of time to file the combined brief and COA. As construed, grants appellant's motion to extend time to file brief/certificate of appealability. Appellant's brief/COA now due 10/16/2019 for Polly Hopper. See order for additonal information. Served on 09/10/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 09/10/2019 08:25 AM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Envelope

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Response letter

Open Document

[10673034] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellant's motion to appoint attorney [ # 10673032-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). The combined opening brief and certificate of appealability remains due 9/16/19. Failure to file the brief may result in dismissal of this appeal. Served on 08/23/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:58 AM]

Open Document

[10673032] Appellant's letter, construed as a motion filed by Ms. Polly Hopper to appoint attorney. Served on 08/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:56 AM]

Open Document

[10668805] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting attorney Todd A. Coberly's motion to withdraw as attorney for Appellant Polly Hopper. Mr. Coberly is appointed nunc pro tunc to the date the notice of appeal was filed, which ends with the entry of this order. The request for appointment of new counsel is denied without prejudice to a showing that 18 USC Sec. 3006(A)(2)(B). Appellant will now proceed pro se in this matter. Appellant's brief and application for COA due on 09/16/2019 for Polly Hopper. See attached order. Served on 08/06/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:25 PM]

Open Document

[10668702] Order filed by Clerk of the Court lifting the abatement of this appeal upon receipt of the district court's decision regarding certificate of appealability. The motion to withdraw and for appointment of counsel will be addressed by separate order. Served on 08/06/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/06/2019 01:17 PM]

Open Document

[10668594] Supplemental preliminary record filed consisting of the District Court order denying COA. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:43 AM]

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10677202] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter comes on for consideration on appellant's second motion for appointment of counsel. By order of 8/23/2019, appellant was advised that no action would be taken on the motion for appointment at this time, and that the motion would be referred to the merits panel. Once appellant has filed his opening brief and COA, the court may consider appellant's own statement of the arguments on appeal. The court construes appellant's motion as requesting an extension of time to file the combined brief and COA. As construed, grants appellant's motion to extend time to file brief/certificate of appealability. Appellant's brief/COA now due 10/16/2019 for Polly Hopper. See order for additonal information. Served on 09/10/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 09/10/2019 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10676951] Appellant's motion filed by Ms. Polly Hopper to appoint attorney and to extend time to file COA and brief until unspecified date. Served on 08/27/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2110] [Entered: 09/09/2019 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10673607] Miscellaneous correspondence received from Ms. Polly Hopper but not filed. Response letter attached. Served on 08/20/2019. Manner of Service: US mail (court only). [19-2110] [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10673034] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring Appellant's motion to appoint attorney [ # 10673032-2 ] to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). The combined opening brief and certificate of appealability remains due 9/16/19. Failure to file the brief may result in dismissal of this appeal. Served on 08/23/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10673032] Appellant's letter, construed as a motion filed by Ms. Polly Hopper to appoint attorney. Served on 08/19/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/23/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668805] Order filed by Judges Matheson and Bacharach granting attorney Todd A. Coberly's motion to withdraw as attorney for Appellant Polly Hopper. Mr. Coberly is appointed nunc pro tunc to the date the notice of appeal was filed, which ends with the entry of this order. The request for appointment of new counsel is denied without prejudice to a showing that 18 USC Sec. 3006(A)(2)(B). Appellant will now proceed pro se in this matter. Appellant's brief and application for COA due on 09/16/2019 for Polly Hopper. See attached order. Served on 08/06/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668702] Order filed by Clerk of the Court lifting the abatement of this appeal upon receipt of the district court's decision regarding certificate of appealability. The motion to withdraw and for appointment of counsel will be addressed by separate order. Served on 08/06/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/06/2019 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10668594] Supplemental preliminary record filed consisting of the District Court order denying COA. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/06/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667732] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2, Comments: Vol. 1-pleadings; Vol 2-sealed pledings. [19-2110] [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667132] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter is before the us following review of appellant's docketing statement. This court directs a limited remand. Pending a decision by the district court, this appeal is abated. Appellant's motion to withdraw as attorney [ # 10666996-2 ] is taken under advisement. Please see order for additional detailed information. Served on 07/31/2019. [19-2110] [Entered: 07/31/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666996] Motion filed by Appellant Ms. Polly Hopper for attorney Todd A. Coberly to withdraw as counsel. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10666972] Minute order filed - Record on appeal due district court 08/20/2019. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-2110] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666960] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Ms. Polly Hopper. Served on: 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666952] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Todd A. Coberly for Ms. Polly Hopper. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666950] Designation of record filed by Appellant Ms. Polly Hopper. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666929] Docketing statement filed by Ms. Polly Hopper. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • [10666909] Entry of appearance submitted by Todd A. Coberly for Appellant Ms. Polly Hopper for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/30/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 07/30/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-2110] TAC [Entered: 07/30/2019 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665983] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Paige Messec for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] --[Edited 07/26/2019 by AT to add correct entry of appearance form.] [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • [10665974] Entry of appearance submitted by C. Paige Messec for Appellee United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-2110] --[Edited 07/26/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 7/26/2019.] PM [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663440] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/12/2019,07/12/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form, designation of record, and appointment motion due 07/30/2019 for Polly Hopper. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2019 for Polly Hopper and United States of America. [19-2110] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.