This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/22/2022 at 09:19:48 (UTC).

United States v. D. B.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 United States filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against D B. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2005

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Defendant / Appellant

D.B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Megan Poppen

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

515 Ninth Street

Rapid City, SD 57701-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

D.B.

Attorney at JUVENILE SERVICES CENTER

3505 Cambell Street

Rapid City, SD 57702

Terry Lee Pechota

Attorney at PECHOTA LAW OFFICE

1617 Sheridan Lake Road

Rapid City, SD 57702-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CRIMINAL case docketed. [5158392] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:27 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Appointing Terry Lee Pechota for D.B. under the Criminal Justice Act. [5158406] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:38 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:This criminal appeal involves a juvenile offender. In accordance with 18 U.S.C. Section 5038(a-f) regarding confidentiality of information and privacy protection, all papers filed with this court which disclose the name of or any information concerning a juvenile shall be sealed. (SEE order for complete details) [5158411] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:41 PM]

Open Document

CRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 06/01/2022. Transcript due 06/01/2022. Brief of appellant D.B. due 06/15/2022. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5158412] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:44 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: PSI report due 06/01/2022. Transcript due 06/01/2022. Brief of appellant D.B. due 06/15/2022. Appellee(s) brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant(s) brief. Appellant reply brief is due 7 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee's brief. [5158412] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:This criminal appeal involves a juvenile offender. In accordance with 18 U.S.C. Section 5038(a-f) regarding confidentiality of information and privacy protection, all papers filed with this court which disclose the name of or any information concerning a juvenile shall be sealed. (SEE order for complete details) [5158411] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Appointing Terry Lee Pechota for D.B. under the Criminal Justice Act. [5158406] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket**SEALED** Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries,and Judgment 4/28/22. This appeal involves a juvenile offender. [5158400] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL case docketed. [5158392] [22-2005] (MMH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terry L. Pechota