This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/27/2020 at 05:23:22 (UTC).

United States of America v. Seabrook

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 United States of America filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Seabrook. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1918

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

Murray Huberfeld

Appellee

United States of America

Defendant / Appellant

Norman Seabrook

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Lara Elizabeth Pomerantz Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

1 St. Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Martin Bell

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

1 St. Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Won S. Shin

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

1 St. Andrew'S Plaza

New York, NY 10007

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Richard Ware Levitt

Attorney at Levitt & Kaizer

40 Fulton Street

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2868101] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 07:18 PM]

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Norman Seabrook, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2868024] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:04 PM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2867879] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:08 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Norman Seabrook, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2867525] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:48 PM]

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/15/2020, RECEIVED.[2866965] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:43 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Criminal_Docketing_Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Martin Bell for United States of America, in case 20-1918, [ # 11 ], ADDED.[2868185] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2868101] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 07:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Norman Seabrook, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2868024] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY, Lara Elizabeth Pomerantz for United States of America, in case 20-1918, [ # 8 ], ADDED.[2867909] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2867879] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Norman Seabrook, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2867525] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2866968] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/15/2020, RECEIVED.[2866965] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Norman Seabrook, FILED. [2866964] [20-1918] [Entered: 06/22/2020 04:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less