Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2021 at 05:23:47 (UTC).

United States of America v. Gorcyca

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 United States of America filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Gorcyca. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-855

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellee

United States of America

Defendant / Appellant

Bruce Anthony Gorcyca, AKA Tony DeMarco, AKA Tony D. Marco, AKA Anthony DiMarco, AKA Tony Dimarco

Long Island City, NY 11101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Kaitlin Teresa Farrell Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York

271A Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Bruce Anthony Gorcyca

2110 Borden Avenue, Unit G28

Long Island City, NY 11101

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/09/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3074785] [21-855] [Entered: 04/09/2021 05:55 PM]

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3073891] [21-855] [Entered: 04/08/2021 06:29 PM]

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3069819] [21-855] [Entered: 04/05/2021 08:48 AM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court docket as entry dated 02/18/2021, RECEIVED.[3069724] [21-855] [Entered: 04/04/2021 01:06 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Criminal_Docketing_Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/09/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail.[3074785] [21-855] [Entered: 04/09/2021 05:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY, Kaitlin T. Farrell, [ # 5 ], in place of attorney David C. James, SUBSTITUTED.[3074037] [21-855] [Entered: 04/09/2021 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee USA United States of America, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF, US mail. [3073891] [21-855] [Entered: 04/08/2021 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3069819] [21-855] [Entered: 04/05/2021 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3069725] [21-855] [Entered: 04/04/2021 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court docket as entry dated 02/18/2021, RECEIVED.[3069724] [21-855] [Entered: 04/04/2021 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CRIMINAL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Anthony Gorcyca, FILED. [3069723] [21-855] [Entered: 04/04/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less