Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/29/2019 at 09:36:12 (UTC).

United States of America v. American Express Company

Case Summary

On 05/21/2015 United States of America filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against American Express Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    15-1672

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Abercrombie & Fitch Co.

Saks Incorporated

Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.

Lowe's Companies, Inc.

The Buckle, Inc.

Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc.

Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc.

WFM Hawaii, Inc.

Amicus Curiae

Michael A. Carrier, Law Professor

Bridgestone Americas Inc.

Nestle Waters North America Inc.

MorphoTrust USA, LLC

SuperValu, Inc.

Einer R. Elhauge, Law Professor

Caleres, Inc.

Lawrence J. White

Regents of the University of California

Plaintiff / Appellees

State of Idaho

State of Iowa

State of Ohio

191 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert Neal Webner Esq.

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease LLP

52 East Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

James A. Wilson

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease LLP

52 East Gay Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Brett Delange Esq.

Attorney at Idaho Office of the Attorney General

700 West Jefferson Street, P.O. Box 83720

Boise, ID 83720

Mitchell L. Gentile Esq.

Attorney at Ohio Office of the Attorney General

150 East Gay Street

Columbua, OH 43215

Other Attorneys

Frank M. Lowrey Esq. IV

Attorney at Bondurant Mixson & Elmore, LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30309

Elai Katz Esq.

Attorney at Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Fields Alexander Esq.

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

David M. Ashton

Attorney at Texas Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

Ronald Martin Weber Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Crowley Norman LLP

3 Riverway

Houston, TX 77056

Kristen Ceara Limarzi

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Eric F. Citron Esq.

Attorney at Goldstein & Russell, P.C.

7475 Wisconsin Avenue

Bethesda, MD 20814

D. J. Pascoe Esq.

Attorney at Michigan Department of Attorney General

525 West Ottawa Street, P.O. 30755

Lansing, MI 48909

Chadwick O. Brooker

Attorney at Illinois Office of the Attorney General

100 West Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

David W. Jones Esq.

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Edmund F. Murray Esq.

Attorney at Rhode Island Office of the Attorney General

150 South Main Street

Providence, RI 02906

Eric L. Bloom Esq.

Attorney at Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller

4400 Deer Path Road

Harrisburg, PA 17110

Elizabeth Petrela Papez Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

1700 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

James Almon Esq.

Attorney at Kenny Nachwalter, PA

1441 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Rachel O. Davis

Attorney at Connecticut Office of the Attorney General

55 Elm Street, P.O. Box 120

Hartford, CT 06141

Lloyd Nolan Duck Esq. III

Attorney at Nix, Patterson & Roach, LLP

3600 North Capital Of Texas Hwy

Austin, TX 78746

34 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#479

(#479) U.S. SUPREME COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2018, RECEIVED.[2355951] [15-1672] [Entered: 07/31/2018 10:49 AM]

477 #2

Supreme Court Opinion

477 #1

Supreme Court Opinion RECEIVED

#476

(#476) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2213881] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/16/2018 11:43 AM]

474 #4

Supreme Court Record Request Letter

474 #3

Certified General Docket

474 #2

Certified Clerk's Certificate

474 #1

Case to Supreme Court TRANSMITTED

#473

(#473) U.S. SUPREME COURT LETTER, dated 01/09/2018, requesting record be transmitted to the Supreme Court, RECEIVED.[2213508] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/16/2018 09:20 AM]

#1

(#9) ATTORNEY, Nickolai G. Levin, [ # 1 ], in place of attorney Varuni Nelson, SUBSTITUTED.[1516717] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:06 PM]

8 #2

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

8 #1

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#7

(#7) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516713] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:04 PM]

#6

(#6) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516712] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:03 PM]

#5

(#5) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516710] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:02 PM]

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/19/2015, RECEIVED.[1516707] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:01 PM]

#2

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

2 #1

Case FILED

251 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#479) U.S. SUPREME COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2018, RECEIVED.[2355951] [15-1672] [Entered: 07/31/2018 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#477) U.S. SUPREME COURT OPINION, dated 06/25/2018, affirming the judgment of the Court of Appeals, RECEIVED.[2335661] [15-1672] [Entered: 06/29/2018 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#476) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2213881] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/16/2018 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#474) E-CASE, with attached documents, numbered from 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 11, 14, 17, 19, 31, 32, 35, 36, 38, 39, 43, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 53, 55, 58, 72, 73, 79, 80, 83, 84, 86, 89, 90, 96, 104, 105, 110, 111, 112, 118, 122, 123, 126, 127, 128, 132, 133, 134, 135, 140, 145, 149, 150, 164, 167, 169, 170, 173, 181, 185, 187, 190, 195, 197, 200, 201, 203, 204, 205, 206, 207, 208, 209, 210, 219, 224, 227, 228, 232, 235, 237, 238, 241, 244, 245, 247, 248, 249, 250, 251, 252, 253, 254, 255, 256, 257, 262, 265, 267, 270, 271, 274, 275, 276, 277, 278, 279, 280, 281, 282, 283, 284, 285, 288, 289, 302, 303, 305, 310, 311, 312, 313, 314, 315, 316, 317, 318, 320, 325, 329, 332, 334, 355, 358, 377, 380, 383, 384, 386, 388, 389, 391, 395, 396, 400, 401, 402, 403, 404, 405, 407, 409, 411, 417, 418, 420, 421, 422, 424, 425, 426, 431, 432, 433, 434, 445, 449, 451, 453, 454, 455, 458, 462, and 463, to Supreme Court, TRANSMITTED.[2213531] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/16/2018 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#473) U.S. SUPREME COURT LETTER, dated 01/09/2018, requesting record be transmitted to the Supreme Court, RECEIVED.[2213508] [15-1672] [Entered: 01/16/2018 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#470) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 10/16/2017, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 16-1454, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is granted, RECEIVED.[2148730] [15-1672] [Entered: 10/17/2017 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#469) REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee, RECEIVED.[2104338] [15-1672] [Entered: 08/18/2017 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#467) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellee Iowa, et al., a further extension to file Writ of Certiorari, to and including 06/02/2017, FILED.[2024170] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/02/2017 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#468) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellee United States of America a further extension to file Writ of Certiorari, to an including 06/02/2017, FILED.[2024205] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/02/2017 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#464) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, granting Appellee State of Arizona, State of Connecticut, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of Ohio, State of Rhode Island, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of Vermont and United States of America extension to file Writ of Certiorari, FILED.[2002092] [15-1672] [Entered: 03/31/2017 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
297 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1516780] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY, Nickolai G. Levin, [ # 1 ], in place of attorney Varuni Nelson, SUBSTITUTED.[1516717] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 05/22/2015 by CM/ECF. [1516537] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1516714] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516713] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516712] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1516710] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/19/2015, RECEIVED.[1516707] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., district court docket entry re: receipt # 0207-7759546, FILED.[1516697] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants American Express Company and American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., FILED. [1516695] [15-1672] [Entered: 05/22/2015 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caleres, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Whole Foods Market Pacific Northwest, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Buckle, Inc. is a litigant