This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:06:12 (UTC).

United Specialty Insurance Com v. Hachiman, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 United Specialty Insurance Com filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hachiman, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15210

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

ALEXANDER POTASI

JOHNARO LAIRD

MARINA LAIRD

DEREK FESOLAI

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant / Appellants

CRAIG PARKS

LACY'S, LLC, DBA Lacy's

PALOMINO CLUB, LLC, DBA Palomino Club

ADAM GENTILE

HACHIMAN, LLC, DBA Lacy's, DBA Palomino Club, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

L. Renee Green Esquire

Attorney at Kravitz, Schnitzer & Johnson, Chtd.

8985 S. Eastern Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Martin J. Kravitz

Attorney at Kravitz, Schnitzer, Sloane and Johnson

8985 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

James E. Whitmire Esquire

Attorney at Santoro Whitmire

10100 W. Charleston Blvd., Suite # 250

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - SEPARATE CONFERENCE CALLS - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellants only, 4/14/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time, and, DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellee only, 4/15/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11655402] (BLS) [Entered: 04/08/2020 01:19 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/07/2020, 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11643259] (BLS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:52 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/26/2020, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11609862] (BLS) [Entered: 02/26/2020 02:09 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Adam Gentile, Hachiman, LLC, Lacy's, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC and Craig Parks Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11602513] [20-15210] (Whitmire, James) [Entered: 02/19/2020 05:39 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC) The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of timely filed motions listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motions. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motions, appellants shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellants intend to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motions, appellants must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11596201] (TSP) [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:53 AM]

#2

(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, amended 2/7/20. [11596176] (CW) [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:46 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - SEPARATE CONFERENCE CALLS - DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellants only, 4/14/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time, and, DIAL-IN Conference w/ appellee only, 4/15/2020, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11655402] (BLS) [Entered: 04/08/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 04/07/2020, 2:30 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11643259] (BLS) [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 03/26/2020, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11609862] (BLS) [Entered: 02/26/2020 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11602544]. [20-15210] (AD) [Entered: 02/19/2020 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Adam Gentile, Hachiman, LLC, Lacy's, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC and Craig Parks Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11602513] [20-15210] (Whitmire, James) [Entered: 02/19/2020 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC) The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of timely filed motions listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motions. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motions, appellants shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellants intend to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motions, appellants must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11596201] (TSP) [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court, amended 2/7/20. [11596176] (CW) [Entered: 02/13/2020 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Adam Gentile, Hachiman, LLC, Lacy's, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC and Craig Parks Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/19/2020. Appellants Adam Gentile, Hachiman, LLC, Lacy's, LLC, Palomino Club, LLC and Craig Parks opening brief due 04/15/2020. Appellee United Specialty Insurance Company answering brief due 05/15/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11595054] (RT) [Entered: 02/12/2020 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.