This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2019 at 06:04:38 (UTC).

Uniloc USA, Inc. v. Samsung Electronics America

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Uniloc USA, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2072

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

UNILOC 2017 LLC

UNILOC LUXEMBOURG S.A.

UNILOC USA, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kevin Gannon

Attorney at Hayes Messina Gilman & Hayes

200 State Street, 6Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

James J. Foster

Attorney at Prince Lobel Tye LLP

One International Place, Suite 3700

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Allan A. Kassenoff

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Richard A. Edlin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) FILED from Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 08/28/2019 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [631707] [19-2072] [James Foster] [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:08 PM]

#10

(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/24/2019 by email. [623319] [19-2072] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:07 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Certificate of Interest [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/31/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [623175] [TAM] [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:05 PM]

#8

(#8) Entry of appearance for Richard A. Edlin as of counsel for Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621136] [19-2072] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:32 PM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Allan A. Kassenoff as principal counsel for Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621134] [19-2072] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:29 PM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621133] [19-2072] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 9 ] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:28 PM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621132] [19-2072] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:25 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [619974] [19-2072] [James Foster] [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:56 AM]

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [619973] [19-2072] [James Foster] [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:54 AM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for James J. Foster as principal counsel for Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [619971] [19-2072] [James Foster] [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:53 AM]

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FILED from Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. Title: OPENING BRIEF. Service: 08/28/2019 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [631707] [19-2072] [James Foster] [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/24/2019 by email. [623319] [19-2072] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Certificate of Interest [ # 6 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 07/31/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [623175] [TAM] [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Richard A. Edlin as of counsel for Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621136] [19-2072] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Allan A. Kassenoff as principal counsel for Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621134] [19-2072] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621133] [19-2072] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 9 ] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Service: 07/15/2019 by email. [621132] [19-2072] [Allan Kassenoff] [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [619974] [19-2072] [James Foster] [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [619973] [19-2072] [James Foster] [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for James J. Foster as principal counsel for Appellants Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc 2017 LLC. Service: 07/10/2019 by email. [619971] [19-2072] [James Foster] [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/26/2019. [618048] Entry of Appearance due 07/15/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 07/15/2019. Docketing Statement due 07/15/2019. Appellant's brief is due 08/30/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 07/01/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Samsung Electronics America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniloc 2017 LLC is a litigant