This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/20/2020 at 06:14:12 (UTC).

Uniformed Fire Officers Associ v. DeBlasio

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Uniformed Fire Officers Associ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DeBlasio. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3177

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

New York City Department of Corrections

Cynthia Brann, in her official capacity as the Commissioner of the New York City Department of Corrections

City of New York

Frederick Davie, in his official capacity as the Chair of the Civilian Complaint Review Board

New York City Fire Department

Daniel A. Nigro, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the Fire Department of the City of New York

New York City Police Department

Dermot F. Shea, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the New York City Police Department

Civilian Complaint Review Board

Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of New York

Plaintiff / Appellees

Detectives' Endowment Association

Captains Endowment Association

Sergeants Benevolent Association

Uniformed Fire Officers Association

Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.

Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York

Lieutenants Benevolent Association

Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.

Intervenor

Communities United for Police Reform

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Anthony P. Coles Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Courtney Gilligan Saleski Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1 Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Intervenor Attorney

Alex V. Chachkes Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#124

#123

#122

#118

#117

#116

#114

#108

101 #2

Supporting Document

101 #1

Motion for Leave to File as Amicus FILED

#100

#99

#97

#92

#91

#90

#89

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Captains Endowment Association, Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association and Uniformed Fire Officers Association in 20-2789, FILED. Service date 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF. [2978609] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 11/19/2020 10:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Girls for Gender Equity and Transgender Law Center, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2975310] [20-2789, 20-3177]--[Edited 11/16/2020 by JW] [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance[115], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Communities United for Police Reform in 20-2789, Appellant Communities United for Police Reform in 20-3177, FILED.[2974934] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 11/16/2020 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Lawyer's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2974779] [20-2789, 20-3177]--[Edited 11/16/2020 by JW] [Entered: 11/16/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Girls for Gender Equity and Transgender Law Center, FILED. Service date 11/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2971983] [20-2789, 20-3177]--[Edited 11/10/2020 by JW] [Entered: 11/10/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Lawyer's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, FILED. Service date 11/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2971901] [20-2789, 20-3177]--[Edited 11/10/2020 by JW] [Entered: 11/10/2020 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket(#115) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Communities United for Police Reform in 20-2789, Appellant Communities United for Police Reform in 20-3177, FILED. Service date 11/10/2020 by CM/ECF. [2971870] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 11/10/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellee-Cross-Appellant Communities United for Police Reform's notice of appearance in 20-2789[ # 66 ] from the docket, FILED.[2971559] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 11/10/2020 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file late amicus curiae brief [ # 101 ], on behalf of Movant Common Cause/NY, Reinvent Albany, Citizens Union and BetaNYC, FILED. [2970706][108] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 11/09/2020 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#105) CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF[ # 2970491-2 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Alvin Bragg, Taryn Merkl, Chiraag Bains, Nathaniel Akerman, G. Michael Bellinger, Richard F. Albert, Roland G. Riopelle, Isabelle A. Kirshner, Alexander Rias, Lauren-Brooke Eisen and Xavier Donaldson, in 20-2789, FILED.[2970580] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Law Enforcement Action Partnership, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2944160] [20-2789, 20-3177]--[Edited 10/02/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2938040] [20-3177] [Entered: 09/24/2020 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Communities United for Police Reform, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2936397] [20-3177] [Entered: 09/22/2020 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Communities United for Police Reform, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2936396] [20-3177] [Entered: 09/22/2020 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Communities United for Police Reform, FILED. Service date 09/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2936391] [20-3177] [Entered: 09/22/2020 05:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTE: See lead case, 20-2789, containing complete set of docket entries.[2934974] [20-3177] [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2934971] [20-3177] [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Communities United for Police Reform, district court receipt # ANYSDC-21751952, FILED.[2934968] [20-3177] [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/21/2020, RECEIVED.[2934966] [20-3177] [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Communities United for Police Reform in 20-3177, FILED. [2934963] [20-3177, 20-2789] [Entered: 09/21/2020 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lieutenants Benevolent Association is a litigant