This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/23/2020 at 06:01:38 (UTC).

Uniformed Fire Officers Associ v. DeBlasio

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Uniformed Fire Officers Associ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DeBlasio. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2789

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Petitioner

New York State Black, Puerto Rican, Hispanic & Asian Legislative Caucus

Plaintiff / Appellants

Lieutenants Benevolent Association

Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York

Captains Endowment Association

Sergeants Benevolent Association

Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.

Uniformed Fire Officers Association

Detectives' Endowment Association

Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

New York City Police Department

Civilian Complaint Review Board

Frederick Davie, in his official capacity as the Chair of the Civilian Complaint Review Board

Cynthia Brann, in her official capacity as the Commissioner of the New York City Department of Corrections

New York City Department of Corrections

Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of New York

Daniel A. Nigro, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the Fire Department of the City of New York

New York City Fire Department

City of New York

Dermot F. Shea, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the New York City Police Department

Intervenor

Communities United for Police Reform

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pamela S.C. Reynolds Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

375 Woodcliff Drive

Fairport, NY 14450

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Courtney Gilligan Saleski Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1 Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Anthony P. Coles Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott Nathan Shorr

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Richard Paul Dearing Esq.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Elina Druker

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Intervenor Attorneys

Alex V. Chachkes Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Tiffany R. Wright Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Columbia Center, 1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Other Attorneys

Nathaniel Greeley Lambright

Attorney at Blitman & King LLP

Franklin Center, 443 North Franklin Street

Syracuse, NY 13204

Paul J. Wooten Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Paul K. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Archer, Byington, Glennon & Levine, LLP

1 Huntington Quadrangle, P.O. Box 9064

Melville, NY 11747

Jeffrey Peter Mans Esq.

Attorney at Jeffrey P. Mans, Esq.

P.O. Box 11-282

Albany, NY 12211

Juan Cartagena Esq.

Attorney at Latino Justice PRLDEF

475 Riverside Drive

New York, NY 10115

Aaron Harvey Marks Esq.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Joel David Bertocchi Esq.

Attorney at Akerman LLP

71 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Molly Biklen Esq.

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Alec Schierenbeck Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Andrew C. Quinn Esq.

Attorney at The Quinn Law Firm

399 Knollwood Road

White Plains, NY 10603

Chris Hollinger Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

2 Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor, San Francisco

San Francisco, CA 94111

Racquel B. Martin Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

2 Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor, San Francisco

San Francisco, CA 94111

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#248

#242

#240

238 #2

Supporting Document

238 #1

Motion FILED (c)

#231

225 #3

Amicus Brief for the Police Conference of New York in Support of Plaintiffs Appe

221 #2

Supporting Document

221 #1

Motion for Leave to File as Amicus FILED

#215

#12

#9

#8

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#248) MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 240 ] on behalf of New York State Association of Police Benevolent Associations, Affiliated Police Associations of Westchester and the Rockland County Police Benevolent Association, in 20-2789, FILED. [2955072][248] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 10/19/2020 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#245) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION[ # 240 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae New York State Association of Police Benevolent Associations, Affiliated Police Associations of Westchester, and Rockland County Police Benevolent Association in 20-2789, FILED.[2954212] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 10/16/2020 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docket(#244) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, amicus brief[234], on behalf of Amicus Curiae New York State Association of Police Benevolent Associations, Affiliated Police Associations of Westchester, and Rockland County Police Benevolent Association in 20-2789, FILED.[2954209] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 10/16/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#242) MOTION ORDER, referring motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 238 ] filed by Movant Suffolk County Police Conference, Inc., Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Inc. and Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Benevolent Association, Inc., FILED. [2954158][242] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 10/16/2020 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#240) MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954007] [20-2789] [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#236) MOTION ORDER, referring motions to file amicus curiae brief [ # 215 ], [ # 221 ], [ # 225 ], [ # 231 ], FILED. [2953821][236] [20-2789, 20-3177]--[Edited 10/16/2020 by WD] [Entered: 10/16/2020 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#238) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Movant Metropolitan Transportation Authority Police Benevolent Association, Inc., Suffolk County Police Benevolent Association, Inc. and Suffolk County Police Conference, Inc. in 20-2789, FILED. Service date 10/16/2020 by email.[2953867] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#234) AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae New York State Association of Police Benevolent Associations, Affiliated Police Associations of Westchester, and Rockland County Police Benevolent Association, FILED. Service date 10/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2953455] [20-2789]--[Edited 10/16/2020 by JW]--[Edited 10/16/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/15/2020 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date10/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2953344] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#225) MOTION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, on behalf of Non-Party Filer(s), FILED. Service date10/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2952070] [20-2789, 20-3177] [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
148 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bill de Blasio, City of New York, New York City Fire Department, Daniel A. Nigro, New York City Department of Corrections, Cynthia Brann, New York City Police Department, Frederick Davie, Civilian Complaint Review Board and Dermot F. Shea, FILED. Service date 08/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2915837] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/25/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Scott Nathan Shorr for Cynthia Brann City of New York New York City Fire Department Frederick Davie Daniel A. Nigro Bill de Blasio New York City Police Department Civilian Complaint Review Board Dermot F. Shea New York City Department of Corrections, in case 20-2789, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2915685] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Elina Druker, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney James E. Johnson, SUBSTITUTED.[2915682] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/25/2020 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Frederick Davie, Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Corrections, New York City Fire Department, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro and Dermot F. Shea, FILED. Service date 08/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2915593] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/25/2020 07:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Frederick Davie, Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Corrections, New York City Fire Department, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro and Dermot F. Shea, FILED. Service date 08/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2915579] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/25/2020 12:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTE: See lead case, 20-2400, containing complete set of docket entries.[2915167] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2915163] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association and Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, district court receipt # ANYSDC-21295681, FILED.[2915162] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/21/2020, RECEIVED.[2915160] [20-2789] [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association and Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York in 20-2789, FILED. [2915157] [20-2789, 20-2400] [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lieutenants Benevolent Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniformed Fire Officers Association is a litigant