This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/27/2020 at 06:01:06 (UTC).

Uniformed Fire Officers Associ v. DeBlasio

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Uniformed Fire Officers Associ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DeBlasio. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2400

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Intervenors and Petitioners

Communities United for Police Reform

The New York Times Company

Amicus Curiae and Appellee

New York Civil Liberties Union

Plaintiff / Appellants

Lieutenants Benevolent Association

Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York

Captains Endowment Association

Sergeants Benevolent Association

Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.

Uniformed Fire Officers Association

Detectives' Endowment Association

Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc.

Defendant / Appellees

New York City Police Department

Civilian Complaint Review Board

Frederick Davie, in his official capacity as the Chair of the Civilian Complaint Review Board

Cynthia Brann, in her official capacity as the Commissioner of the New York City Department of Corrections

New York City Department of Corrections

Bill de Blasio, in his official capacity as Mayor of the City of New York

Daniel A. Nigro, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the Fire Department of the City of New York

New York City Fire Department

City of New York

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor and Petitioner Attorneys

Alex V. Chachkes Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

David Edward McCraw Esq.

Attorney at The New York Times Company

620 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Alexandra Perloff-Giles Esq.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Amicus Curiae and Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Thomas Dunn

Attorney at New York Civil Liberties Union

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Molly Biklen Esq.

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Courtney Gilligan Saleski Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1 Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Anthony P. Coles Esq.

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott Nathan Shorr

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Elina Druker

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Richard Paul Dearing Esq.

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Other Attorneys

Bruce D. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

1156 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Ye Eun E. Chun Esq.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

1 Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Roger A. Cooper

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

1 Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Joseph M. Kay Esq.

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

1 Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

KatieLynn B. Townsend Esq.

Attorney at Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

1156 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#161

#160

#159

#153

#150

#149

#148

#147

#120

#119

#118

#110

#109

#107

#104

#103

#102

#101

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#161) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 09/01/2020, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2920988] [20-2400] [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#160) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2920970] [20-2400] [Entered: 09/01/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#159) NEW CASE MANAGER, Margaret Lain, ASSIGNED.[2920888] [20-2400] [Entered: 09/01/2020 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) CURED DEFECTIVE FRAP 42 STIPULATION[ # 153 ], on behalf of Appellants Captains Endowment Association, et al., FILED.[2920713] [20-2400] [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(#154) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 stipulation[151], on behalf of Appellants Captains Endowment Association, et al., FILED.[2920711] [20-2400] [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 08/31/2020 by CM/ECF.[2920655] [20-2400] [Entered: 08/31/2020 08:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#151) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 08/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2919476] [20-2400] [Entered: 08/28/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) CAPTION, as per opinion dated 08/27/2020, AMENDED.[2917686] [20-2400] [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, to SDNY (New York City), ISSUED.[2917673] [20-2400] [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) NON-DISPOSITIVE OPINION, motion for a stay of the District Courts July 29 order pending appeal is denied, thereby terminating the emergency stay entered July 30, by JON, RSP, PWH, FILED.[2917666] [20-2400] [Entered: 08/27/2020 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Motion to Stay, on behalf of Appellant Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association and Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, FILED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2895784] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 08:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae New York Civil Liberties Union, informing the Court that due to the time sensitivity, they will be filing a response to the emergency motion by 8 pm today, RECEIVED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2895767] [20-2400]--[Edited 07/29/2020 by RW] [Entered: 07/29/2020 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY, Elina Druker, [ # 11 ], in place of attorney Appellee Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Frederick Davie, Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Corrections, New York City Fire Department, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro and Dermot F. Shea, SUBSTITUTED.[2895751] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cynthia Brann, City of New York, Civilian Complaint Review Board, Frederick Davie, Bill de Blasio, New York City Department of Corrections, New York City Fire Department, New York City Police Department, Daniel A. Nigro and Dermot F. Shea, FILED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2895733] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association and Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, FILED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF, email. [2895705] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association and Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, FILED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF, email.[2895695] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2895650] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association and Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20895063, FILED.[2895648] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/29/2020, RECEIVED.[2895644] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Captains Endowment Association, Correction Officers' Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Detectives' Endowment Association, Lieutenants Benevolent Association, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Sergeants Benevolent Association, Uniformed Fire Officers Association and Uniformed Firefighters Association of Greater New York, FILED. [2895638] [20-2400] [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lieutenants Benevolent Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Uniformed Fire Officers Association is a litigant