This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/14/2022 at 06:15:39 (UTC).

UMG Recordings, Inc. v. BCD Music Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 UMG Recordings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against BCD Music Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55076

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

UMG RECORDINGS, INC., a Delaware corporation

Defendant / Appellant

BCD MUSIC GROUP, INC., a Texas corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Goldman Esquire

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Brian Yates Esquire

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jonathan Freund

Attorney at Freund Legal

427 North Camden Drive, Suite H

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Craig Huber Esquire

Attorney at Freund Legal

427 North Camden Drive, Suite H

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12347460] (LW) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:11 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant BCD Music Group, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/25/2022. [12350537] [22-55076]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filer. 01/25/2022 by QDL] (Huber, Craig) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:12 PM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 02/10/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12353490] (CL) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:04 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12369755] (CL) [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:56 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12369755] (CL) [Entered: 02/14/2022 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 02/10/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12353490] (CL) [Entered: 01/27/2022 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/25/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12351326]. [22-55076] (AD) [Entered: 01/25/2022 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant BCD Music Group, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/25/2022. [12350537] [22-55076]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filer. 01/25/2022 by QDL] (Huber, Craig) [Entered: 01/25/2022 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) Terminated Brian Yates for UMG Recordings, Inc. in 22-55076 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [12347858] (RY) [Entered: 01/21/2022 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [12347460] (LW) [Entered: 01/21/2022 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant BCD Music Group, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/20/2022. Transcript ordered by 02/09/2022. Transcript due 03/11/2022. Appellant BCD Music Group, Inc. opening brief due 04/20/2022. Appellee UMG Recordings, Inc. answering brief due 05/20/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12340191] (RT) [Entered: 01/13/2022 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant