This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/18/2022 at 06:01:54 (UTC).

Umana Jovel v. Joyce

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 Umana Jovel filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Joyce. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1833

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ronal Umana Jovel

Respondents

William P. Joyce, Acting Field Office Director, New York City Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

David L. Neal, Director of the Executive Office for Immigration Review

Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Merrick Garland, Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

S. Lucas Marquez Esq.

Attorney at Brooklyn Defender Services

177 Livingston Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Alexandra Lampert Esq.

Attorney at Brooklyn Defender Services

156 Pierrepont Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Respondent Attorneys

Rebecca Friedman Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Benjamin H. Torrance

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas and David L. Neal Brief due date as 12/01/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 12/01/2022, FILED.[3383041] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/15/2022 03:33 PM]

#30

RESTRICTED

#28

RESTRICTED

#27

RESTRICTED

#24

RESTRICTED

#20

RESTRICTED

19 #3

Supporting Document

19 #2

Supporting Document

19 #1

Form C FILED

#13

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas and David L. Neal Brief due date as 12/01/2022. Joint Appendix due date as 12/01/2022, FILED.[3383041] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/15/2022 03:33 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas and David L. Neal, informing Court of proposed due date 12/01/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 09/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3382830] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/15/2022 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ATTORNEY, Alexandra Lampert for Ronal Umana Jovel, in case 22-1833 , [ # 28 ], ADDED.[3382389] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/15/2022 09:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ronal Umana Jovel, FILED. Service date 09/14/2022 by CM/ECF. [3382271] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/14/2022 04:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jessica Mckenziez, ASSIGNED.[3380176] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/12/2022 11:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas and David L. Neal, FILED. Service date 09/08/2022 by CM/ECF.[3378971] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/08/2022 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas and David L. Neal, FILED. Service date 09/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3375611] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/01/2022 05:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas and David L. Neal, FILED. Service date 09/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3375609] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/01/2022 05:12 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [ # 15 ], [ # 16 ], on behalf of Appellant Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas and David L. Neal, FILED.[3375269] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/01/2022 11:32 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY, Rebecca Friedman for Alejandro Mayorkas David L. Neal Merrick Garland William P. Joyce, in case 22-1833, [ # 16 ], ADDED.[3375266] [22-1833] [Entered: 09/01/2022 11:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ronal Umana Jovel, FILED. Service date 08/30/2022 by CM/ECF.[3373790] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/30/2022 11:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, S. Lucas Marquez, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Mary Sameera Van Houten Harper, SUBSTITUTED.[3373757] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/30/2022 10:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [ # 7 ], [ # 8 ], on behalf of Appellee Ronal Umana Jovel, FILED.[3373752] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/30/2022 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Ronal Umana Jovel, informing the Court that S. Lucas Marquez is replacing Mary Sameera Van Houten as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 08/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3373417] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/29/2022 04:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ronal Umana Jovel, FILED. Service date 08/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3372546] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/26/2022 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [5], on behalf of Appellee Ronal Umana Jovel, FILED.[3372388] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/26/2022 01:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ronal Umana Jovel, FILED. Service date 08/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3372278] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/26/2022 12:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3370249] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/23/2022 04:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/21/2022, RECEIVED.[3370247] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/23/2022 04:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Merrick Garland, William P. Joyce, Alejandro Mayorkas and David L. Neal, FILED. [3370239] [22-1833] [Entered: 08/23/2022 04:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Friedman Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin H. Torrance