This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/01/2022 at 06:05:43 (UTC).

Uloma Ekpete v. Nancy Pelosi, et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Uloma Ekpete filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nancy Pelosi,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55118

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

NANCY PELOSI, House Speaker

DEMOCRATIC PARTY LEADERSHIP

PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS, INC.

LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF PUBLIC HEALTH

CALIFORNIA LABOR UNION

STEVE HARVEY, Judge

Plaintiff / Appellant

ULOMA STACY EKPETE

Marietta, GA 30067

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

E. Nathan Schilt Esquire

Attorney at Law Office of E. Nathan Schilt

11165 Mountain View Avenue, Suite 121

Loma Linda, CA 92354

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Uloma Stacy Ekpete

3349 River Heights Xing, Se

Marietta, GA 30067

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #2

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #3

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: IFP. Motion filed by Appellant Uloma Ekpete; dated 1/26/22. [12359001] (DJV) [Entered: 02/02/2022 02:24 PM]

5 #1

Fee Due OSC

5 #2

Main Document

5 #3

Additional Document

#6

(#6) Filed Appellant Uloma Ekpete motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 02/03/2022. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/25/2022. [12381193] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2022 06:54 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed Appellant Uloma Ekpete response to for docket fee due. Served on 02/25/2022. [12381194] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2022 06:57 AM]

#8

(#8) Filed Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete letter dated 02/25/2022 re: addendum to DE 7 "edited". Paper filing deficiency: None. [12381621] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2022 11:26 AM]

#9

(#9) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: request to eot to file noa. Motion filed by Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete. [12382043] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2022 02:16 PM]

#10

(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete Correspondence: Update. Date of service: 03/04/2022. [12387131] [22-55118] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 3/7/2022 by TYL] (Ekpete, Uloma) [Entered: 03/04/2022 09:00 PM]

#11

(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete Correspondence: Update. Date of service: 03/07/2022. [12387958] [22-55118] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 3/7/2022 by TYL] (Ekpete, Uloma) [Entered: 03/07/2022 12:24 PM]

#12

(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete Correspondence: Update. Date of service: 03/08/2022. [12389899] [22-55118] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 03/09/2022 by SLM] (Ekpete, Uloma) [Entered: 03/08/2022 07:46 PM]

#13

(#13) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MF): Appellants motion for an extension of time to comply with the February 3, 2022 order is granted [ # 6 ]. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant must comply with the February 3, 2022 order. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [12390684] (CKP) [Entered: 03/09/2022 02:29 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket(#14) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 03/22/2022. [12401697] (BY) [Entered: 03/22/2022 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MF): Appellants motion for an extension of time to comply with the February 3, 2022 order is granted [ # 6 ]. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant must comply with the February 3, 2022 order. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [12390684] (CKP) [Entered: 03/09/2022 02:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete Correspondence: Update. Date of service: 03/08/2022. [12389899] [22-55118] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 03/09/2022 by SLM] (Ekpete, Uloma) [Entered: 03/08/2022 07:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed (ECF) Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete Correspondence: Update. Date of service: 03/07/2022. [12387958] [22-55118] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 3/7/2022 by TYL] (Ekpete, Uloma) [Entered: 03/07/2022 12:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete Correspondence: Update. Date of service: 03/04/2022. [12387131] [22-55118] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 3/7/2022 by TYL] (Ekpete, Uloma) [Entered: 03/04/2022 09:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: request to eot to file noa. Motion filed by Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete. [12382043] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2022 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed Appellant Doctor Uloma Stacy Ekpete letter dated 02/25/2022 re: addendum to DE 7 "edited". Paper filing deficiency: None. [12381621] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2022 11:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Appellant Uloma Ekpete response to for docket fee due. Served on 02/25/2022. [12381194] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2022 06:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Appellant Uloma Ekpete motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 02/03/2022. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/25/2022. [12381193] (DJV) [Entered: 02/28/2022 06:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12359844] (CKP) [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • Docket(#4) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 22-55118: Due] ). [12359840] (CKP) [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docket(#3) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 22-55118: IFP Pending In DC] ). [12359003] (DJV) [Entered: 02/02/2022 02:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Received copy of motion filed in district court re: IFP. Motion filed by Appellant Uloma Ekpete; dated 1/26/22. [12359001] (DJV) [Entered: 02/02/2022 02:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Uloma Ekpete opening brief due 04/04/2022. Appellees California Labor Union, Democratic Party Leadership, Steve Harvey, Loma Linda University School of Public Health, Nancy Pelosi and Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. answering brief due 05/04/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12356551] (RT) [Entered: 01/31/2022 04:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA LABOR UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant