This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/10/2023 at 06:10:39 (UTC).

Ubiquitous Connectivity, LP v. Txu Energy Retail Company LLC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Ubiquitous Connectivity, LP filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Txu Energy Retail Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-1349

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UBIQUITOUS CONNECTIVITY, LP

Defendant / Appellee

TXU ENERGY RETAIL COMPANY LLC

Petitioner / Appellant

CHARLES SHAMOON, SR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John Martin Jackson Esq.

Anita Spieth

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Charles Shamoon Sr.

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#5

(#5) Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Service for Appellant Charles Shamoon, Sr.. Service: 01/23/2023 by clerk. [898726] [VDW] [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:28 PM]

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Txu Energy Retail Company LLC. Service: 01/23/2023 by email, US mail. [898707] [23-1349] [Anita Spieth] [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:02 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Txu Energy Retail Company LLC. Service: 01/23/2023 by email, US mail. [898709] [23-1349] [Anita Spieth] [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:04 PM]

#4

(#4) Entry of Appearance for Anita M. C. Spieth; John M. Jackson as counsel for Appellee Txu Energy Retail Company LLC. Service: 01/23/2023 by email, US mail. [898711] [23-1349] [Anita Spieth] [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:05 PM]

#6

(#6) Amended docket sheet from United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. [899565] [MMA] [Entered: 01/25/2023 02:42 PM]

#8

(#8) MODIFIED ENTRY: INFORMAL BRIEF FILED with APPENDIX by Appellant Charles Shamoon, Sr. Service: 01/27/2023 by clerk. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [900058]--[Edited 01/31/2023 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [JCP] [Entered: 01/27/2023 08:14 AM]

9 #1

Opening Brief

9 #2

Appendix Vol. 1

9 #3

Appendix Vol. 2

 

Docket Entries

03/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) OPENING BRIEF FILED by Appellee Txu Energy Retail Company LLC. Service: 03/08/2023 by email. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) [908551] [23-1349] [Anita Spieth] [Entered: 03/08/2023 11:25 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MODIFIED ENTRY: INFORMAL BRIEF FILED with APPENDIX by Appellant Charles Shamoon, Sr. Service: 01/27/2023 by clerk. Unless ordered otherwise, any responsive deadline runs from the date of service of this brief. See Fed. Cir. R. 31. [900058]--[Edited 01/31/2023 by MMA - Reason: compliance review complete] [JCP] [Entered: 01/27/2023 08:14 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

Docket(#7) Filing fee paid in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas on 01/20/2023. [899567] [MMA] [Entered: 01/25/2023 02:43 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Amended docket sheet from United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. [899565] [MMA] [Entered: 01/25/2023 02:42 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Entry of Appearance for Anita M. C. Spieth; John M. Jackson as counsel for Appellee Txu Energy Retail Company LLC. Service: 01/23/2023 by email, US mail. [898711] [23-1349] [Anita Spieth] [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:05 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Txu Energy Retail Company LLC. Service: 01/23/2023 by email, US mail. [898709] [23-1349] [Anita Spieth] [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:04 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Txu Energy Retail Company LLC. Service: 01/23/2023 by email, US mail. [898707] [23-1349] [Anita Spieth] [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:02 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance and consent to Electronic Service for Appellant Charles Shamoon, Sr.. Service: 01/23/2023 by clerk. [898726] [VDW] [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 12/30/2022. [895593] Fee/IFP due on 01/23/2023. Entry of Appearance due 01/23/2023. Certificate of Interest due on 01/23/2023. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines.--[Edited 01/09/2023 by MMA to revise docket text] [MMA] [Entered: 01/09/2023 01:50 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less