This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 07:04:50 (UTC).

Tyrong Godbold v. John Hammons, et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Tyrong Godbold filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against John Hammons. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1022

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

John Hammons, individually and in his official capacities

The City of Hot Springs, a municipal corporation and public body corporate and politic

Jason Stachey, in his official capacity as Chief of Police Hot Springs Police Department

David Flory, individually and in his official capacity as former Chief of Police

Brandon Jones, individually and in his official capacities

Patrick Langley, individually and in his official capacities

Plaintiff / Appellant

Tyrong Godbold

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jenna Allison Adams

Attorney at ARKANSAS MUNICIPAL LEAGUE

301 W. Second Street, P.O. Box 38

North Little Rock, AR 72115-0000

Brian Wade Albright

626 Malvern Avenue

Hot Springs, AR 71901-0000

Russell A. Wood

Attorney at WOOD LAW FIRM

Suite 4, 501 E. Fourth Street

Russellville, AR 72801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Willard Proctor Jr.

Attorney at WILLARD PROCTOR, JR. P.A.

2500 S. State Street

Little Rock, AR 72206-2162

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4756392-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Willard Proctor, Jr.. Brief of Tyrong Godbold due 03/15/2019. Appendix due on 03/15/2019. [4756460] [19-1022] (CMD) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:05 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 03/15/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Willard Proctor, Jr. for Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold w/service 02/13/2019. [4756392] [19-1022] (Event is edited to reflect the correct date of extension)--[Edited 02/13/2019 by CMD] (WP) [Entered: 02/13/2019 02:42 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold - Joint Appendix - w/service 01/22/2019 [4748065] [19-1022] (WP) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:38 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold - w/service 01/17/2019. [4747239] [19-1022] (WP) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:22 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold. w/service 01/17/2019 [4747238] [19-1022] (WP) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:20 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 01/08/2019 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Extend to Pay Filing Fees or Find Plaintiff Indigent. [4744819] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Brian W. Albright for Appellees Mr. David Flory, Mr. John Hammons, Brandon Jones, Mr. Patrick Langley, Mr. Jason Stachey and The City of Hot Springs w/service 01/09/2019 [4743679] [19-1022] (BWA) [Entered: 01/09/2019 08:57 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Willard Proctor, Jr. for Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold w/service 01/08/2019 [4743621] [19-1022] (WP) [Entered: 01/08/2019 09:01 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jenna Adams for Appellees The City of Hot Springs, Mr. John Hammons, Mr. Patrick Langley, Brandon Jones, Mr. David Flory and Mr. Jason Stachey w/service 01/07/2019 [4742521] [19-1022] (JAA) [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:41 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 02/13/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Tyrong Godbold due 02/13/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4742273] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:23 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum Opinion and Judgment both dated 10/19/2018 and Order dated 11/19/2018. [4742266] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:20 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4742259] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:14 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4756392-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Willard Proctor, Jr.. Brief of Tyrong Godbold due 03/15/2019. Appendix due on 03/15/2019. [4756460] [19-1022] (CMD) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 03/15/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Willard Proctor, Jr. for Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold w/service 02/13/2019. [4756392] [19-1022] (Event is edited to reflect the correct date of extension)--[Edited 02/13/2019 by CMD] (WP) [Entered: 02/13/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold - Joint Appendix - w/service 01/22/2019 [4748065] [19-1022] (WP) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold - w/service 01/17/2019. [4747239] [19-1022] (WP) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold. w/service 01/17/2019 [4747238] [19-1022] (WP) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • UPDATED fee status - [Case Number 19-1022: paid - cs]. Fee paid in district court on 1/8/2019. [4744821] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 01/08/2019 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Extend to Pay Filing Fees or Find Plaintiff Indigent. [4744819] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/10/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Brian W. Albright for Appellees Mr. David Flory, Mr. John Hammons, Brandon Jones, Mr. Patrick Langley, Mr. Jason Stachey and The City of Hot Springs w/service 01/09/2019 [4743679] [19-1022] (BWA) [Entered: 01/09/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Willard Proctor, Jr. for Appellant Mr. Tyrong Godbold w/service 01/08/2019 [4743621] [19-1022] (WP) [Entered: 01/08/2019 09:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Jenna Adams for Appellees The City of Hot Springs, Mr. John Hammons, Mr. Patrick Langley, Brandon Jones, Mr. David Flory and Mr. Jason Stachey w/service 01/07/2019 [4742521] [19-1022] (JAA) [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 02/13/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Tyrong Godbold due 02/13/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4742273] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum Opinion and Judgment both dated 10/19/2018 and Order dated 11/19/2018. [4742266] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4742259] [19-1022] (CMH) [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Willard Proctor Jr.