This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2021 at 06:06:11 (UTC).

Tyrone Glenn v. Joseph Mataloni, et al

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Tyrone Glenn filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Joseph Mataloni. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3616

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

LARISA YARCZOWER, Physician Assistant - PA DOC - SCI - Retreat

Defendant / Appellees

PRISON HEALTH SERVICES INC

WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

ANTHONY CHIAVACCI, Medical Director PA DOC- SCI-Retreat

LARISA YARCZOWER, Physician Assistant - PA DOC - SCI - Retreat

MYRON STANISHEFSKI, Correctional Health Care Administrator - PA - DOC - SCI - Dallas

M.D. STANLEY STANISH, Medical Director - PA - DOC- SCI- Dallas

JOSEPH P. MATALONI, Correctional Health Care Administrator SCI-Retreat

RENATO DIAZ, Medical Director / PA DOC Dallas

Plaintiff / Appellant

TYRONE GLENN

Somerset, PA 15510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John R. Ninosky Esq.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

100 Corporate Center Drive, Suite 201

Camp Hill, PA 17011

Jeffrey J. Wetzel Esq.

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Christopher J. Watson Esq.

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Caleb C. Enerson Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Michael J. Scarinci Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tyrone Glenn

Attorney at Somerset SCI

1600 Walters Mill Road

Somerset, PA 15510

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Warden Letter

18 #1

Clerk IFP PLRA Order - Listing for 1915

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) ORDER (Clerk) The motion to electronically serve all counsel via CM/ECF will be referred to the same panel of this Court that will consider the Appellant's motion for appointment of counsel. No action will be taken on any of the Appellant's pending motions unless the Appellant either pays the docketing fees associated with this appeal or completes a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Appellant is advised that filing extra copies of any motion submitted to the Clerk is not required. Cf. 3d Cir. L.A.R. 27.2. However, Appellant must provide service to parties on appeal of any documents submitted to the Clerk. See Fed. R. App. P. 25(b). If, Appellant is granted in forma pauperis status and the appeal proceeds to briefing, he may automatically file and serve a reduced number of copies of his brief and the appendix. See Fed. R. App. P. 31(b). (CJG) [Entered: 02/11/2021 08:03 AM]

#14

(#14) CLERK LETTER SENT advising Appellant that Local Appellate Rule 24.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(2) require prisoners to reapply to the court of appeals for in forma pauperis status regardless of whether the district court granted you in forma pauperis status and requesting completed forms or payment of the filing fees to the District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:35 PM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) LETTER from Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn advising that he was previously granted In Forma Pauperis status in the District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:24 PM]

#10

(#10) MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn to have Clerk of Court Electronically Serve All Counsel of Record Via CM/ECF. Response, if any, due on 01/25/2021. Certificate of Service dated 01/12/2021. Service made by US mail. (CJG) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:39 AM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher J. Watson, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Renato Diaz, M.D., Anthony Chiavacci, M.D., Stanley Stanish, M.D. and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. [20-3616] (CJW) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:49 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Wexford Health Services. [20-3616] (CJW) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:47 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Prison Health Services Inc. [20-3616] (JRN) [Entered: 01/05/2021 12:01 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John R. Ninosky on behalf of Appellee(s) Prison Health Services, Inc.. [20-3616] (JRN) [Entered: 01/05/2021 12:00 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Scarinci on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph Mataloni, Myron Stanishefski, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. [20-3616] (MJS) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:10 PM]

#4

(#4) Notifying appellant that no action will be taken on the motion for appointment of counsel as appellant has not submitted a motion for in forma pauperis status. Appellant is directed to file a motion for in forma pauperis status within 14 days from date of notice. (CJG) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:54 AM]

#3

(#3) MOTION by Mr. Tyrone Glenn for Appointment of Counsel, received and not filed. (CJG) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:53 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn. The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order; granting. (CJG) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER ADDENDUM on behalf of Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn. (CJG) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (CJG) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER (Clerk) The motion to electronically serve all counsel via CM/ECF will be referred to the same panel of this Court that will consider the Appellant's motion for appointment of counsel. No action will be taken on any of the Appellant's pending motions unless the Appellant either pays the docketing fees associated with this appeal or completes a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Appellant is advised that filing extra copies of any motion submitted to the Clerk is not required. Cf. 3d Cir. L.A.R. 27.2. However, Appellant must provide service to parties on appeal of any documents submitted to the Clerk. See Fed. R. App. P. 25(b). If, Appellant is granted in forma pauperis status and the appeal proceeds to briefing, he may automatically file and serve a reduced number of copies of his brief and the appendix. See Fed. R. App. P. 31(b). (CJG) [Entered: 02/11/2021 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLERK LETTER SENT advising Appellant that Local Appellate Rule 24.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(2) require prisoners to reapply to the court of appeals for in forma pauperis status regardless of whether the district court granted you in forma pauperis status and requesting completed forms or payment of the filing fees to the District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn. (CJG) [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) IN FORMA PAUPERIS PRISONER AUTHORIZATION on behalf of Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn. (CJG) [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER from Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn advising that he was previously granted In Forma Pauperis status in the District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 01/26/2021 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn to have Clerk of Court Electronically Serve All Counsel of Record Via CM/ECF. Response, if any, due on 01/25/2021. Certificate of Service dated 01/12/2021. Service made by US mail. (CJG) [Entered: 01/21/2021 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher J. Watson, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Renato Diaz, M.D., Anthony Chiavacci, M.D., Stanley Stanish, M.D. and Wexford Health Sources, Inc.. [20-3616] (CJW) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Wexford Health Services. [20-3616] (CJW) [Entered: 01/12/2021 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Prison Health Services Inc. [20-3616] (JRN) [Entered: 01/05/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John R. Ninosky on behalf of Appellee(s) Prison Health Services, Inc.. [20-3616] (JRN) [Entered: 01/05/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Scarinci on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph Mataloni, Myron Stanishefski, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections. [20-3616] (MJS) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notifying appellant that no action will be taken on the motion for appointment of counsel as appellant has not submitted a motion for in forma pauperis status. Appellant is directed to file a motion for in forma pauperis status within 14 days from date of notice. (CJG) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Mr. Tyrone Glenn for Appointment of Counsel, received and not filed. (CJG) [Entered: 12/30/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AR) [Entered: 12/29/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrone Glenn in District Court No. 1-20-cv-00069. (AR) [Entered: 12/29/2020 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEXFORD HEALTH SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Corizon Health, Inc. is a litigant