This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2019 at 06:05:30 (UTC).

Tyrome Harris, Sr. v. Arkansas, State of

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 Tyrome Harris, Sr filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Arkansas, State of. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1511

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Arkansas, State of

Plaintiff / Appellant

Tyrome Harris, Sr.

Grady, AR 71644-0500

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Adam Donner Jackson

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

200 Catlett-Prien Building, 323 Center Street

Little Rock, AR 72201-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tyrome Harris Sr.

Attorney at ARKANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

P.O. Box 500

Grady, AR 71644-0500

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 04/29/2019. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is denied. District court declined to issue a certificate of appealability. [4782936] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:10 PM]

Open Document #2

Exhibits

Open Document #1

Motion for Stay of Appeal

Open Document #4

ProSe NDA

Open Document #3

envelope

Open Document #1

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document #2

$5.00 payment for filing fee returned

Open Restricted Document #3

envelope

Open Restricted Document #2

cover letter

Open Restricted Document #4

ProSe NDA

Open Restricted Document #1

motion to proceed on appeal IFP

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Appellant has responded to the show cause order why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to pay the fee or move in the district court for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Appellant has not filed such a motion in the district court. On the court's own motion, Appellant is granted an extension of 14 days to file an IFP motion in the district court. Failure to so do will result in dismissal of the appeal for failure to prosecute. Appellant's motion to stay this appeal will be held in abeyance until the fee/IFP issue is resolved.[4780257] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:14 AM]

Open Document #1

Motion to stay appeal

Open Document #2

envelope

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

Response to order to show cause re: filing fee

Open Document #2

envelope

Open Document #3

ProSe NDA

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • Re-mailed correspondence - clerk letter regarding motion IFP, check returned in this mailing for $5.00. Mailing was returned for unknown reasons. Harris is located at Cummins Unit. Mailing will be re-sent. [ # 4781378-2 ] to Mr. Tyrome Harris, Sr. [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 04/29/2019. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is denied. District court declined to issue a certificate of appealability. [4782936] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/30/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to stay pending appellate proceedings with remand back to District Court to exhaust State/Federal Court Remedies, filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrome Harris, Sr., with exhibits, w/service 03/31/2019. (copies mailed) [4781392] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent regarding motion to proceed on appeal is being forwarded to district court for a ruling; Check in the amount of $5.00 that was received with this filing is being returned (copy of check attached); filing fees are paid in the district court. [4781378] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis w/attached affidavit, filed by Party Mr. Tyrome Harris, Sr. w/service 04/25/2019. (Forwarded to district court for a ruling, copies mailed back to Harris) [4781377] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER: Appellant has responded to the show cause order why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to pay the fee or move in the district court for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Appellant has not filed such a motion in the district court. On the court's own motion, Appellant is granted an extension of 14 days to file an IFP motion in the district court. Failure to so do will result in dismissal of the appeal for failure to prosecute. Appellant's motion to stay this appeal will be held in abeyance until the fee/IFP issue is resolved.[4780257] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to stay pending appeal in order to exhaust state remedies, filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrome Harris, Sr. w/service 04/12/2019. (motion incorporated in response to show cause, page 4), [4779467] [19-1511]--[Edited 04/19/2019 by AEV] (AEV) [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE in opposition to clerk order for failure to pay docket fee [ # 4775143-2 ],clerk order to show cause [ # 4775143-3 ] filed by Party Mr. Tyrome Harris, Sr. , w/service 04/12/2019. [4779460] [19-1511]--[Edited 04/19/2019 by AEV] (AEV) [Entered: 04/19/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Denying [ # 4778031-2 ] motion ext of time to file an amended notice of appeal, filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrome Harris, Sr.; Granting [ # 4778031-3 ] motion ext of time to file an application for certificate of appealability up to May 7, 2019 providing the fee is resolved, filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrome Harris, Sr. [4778047] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file an amended notice of appeal and an application for certificate of appealability until 05/31/2019[4778031], [4778031], filed by Appellant Mr. Tyrome Harris, Sr. w/service 04/04/2019. [4778031] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:APPELLANT has failed to pay to the Clerk of the District Court the requisite docketing fees. APPELLANT is directed to show cause within 14 days why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Response of Tyrome Harris Sr. due 04/22/2019 [4775143] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Adam Jackson for Appellee Arkansas, State of w/service 03/20/2019 [4768961] [19-1511] (ADJ) [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • APPEARANCE filed by Adam Jackson for Appellee Arkansas, State of w/service 03/19/2019 [4768088] [19-1511] DOCUMENT LOCKED. COUNSEL REFILED APPEARANCE FORM.--[Edited 03/21/2019 by AMT] (ADJ) [Entered: 03/19/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4766077] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 04/03/2019, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [4766070] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Recommended Disposition 1/15/19, Order 2/4/19, Judgment 2/4/19, Order 3/5/19, docket entries, [4766069] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Prisoner case docketed. [4766058] [19-1511] (AEV) [Entered: 03/13/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.