This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/04/2019 at 06:06:54 (UTC).

Tyree Bell v. Officer Peter Neukirch, et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Tyree Bell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Officer Peter Neukirch. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1713

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Michael Rader, in his official capacity as a member of the Board of Police Commissioners of Kansas City, Missouri

Captain John Doe, II, in his individual and official capacities

Angela Wasson-Hunt, in her official capacity as Treasurer and a member of the Board of Police Commissioners of Kansas City, Missouri

John Doe, III, in his individual and official capacities

Sergeant John Doe, I, in his individual and official capacities

Darryl Forte, in his former official capacity as Police Chief of the Kansas City, Missouri Police Department

Defendant / Appellees

Richard C. Smith, Police Chief of the Kansas City, Missouri Police Department

Mark Tolbert, in his official capacity as a member of the Board of Police Commissioners of Kansas City, Missouri

Don Wagner, in his official capacity as a member of the Board of Police Commissioners of Kansas City, Missouri

Officer Jonathan Munyan, in his individual capacity

Nathan F. Garrett, in his official capacity as a member of the Board of Police Commissioners of Kansas City, Missouri

Officer Peter Neukirch, in his individual capacity

Luis Ortiz, in his individual and official capacities

Mayor Sylvester "Sly" James, in his official capacity as a member of the Board of Police Commissioners of Kansas City, Missouri

Detective John Mattivi, in his individual capacity

Leland Shurin, in his official capacity as President and a member of the Board of Police Commissioners of Kansas City, Missouri

Plaintiff / Appellant

Tyree Bell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Peter A. Houser

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

207 W. High Street, P.O. Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0000

Diane Peters

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 401, 615 E. 13Th Street

Kansas City, MO 64106

Nicolas Taulbee

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

Suite 401, 615 E. 13Th Street

Kansas City, MO 64106

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Arthur Benson

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ARTHUR BENSON II

4006 Central

Kansas City, MO 64111

Jamie Kathryn Lansford

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ARTHUR BENSON II

4006 Central

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4790875-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell. Brief of Tyree Bell due 06/17/2019. Appendix due on 06/17/2019. [4790911] [19-1713] (CMD) [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:41 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 06/17/2019, filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell w/service 05/23/2019. [4790875] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:43 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4786670-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell. Brief of Tyree Bell due 05/31/2019. Appendix due on 05/31/2019. [4786986] [19-1713] (CMD) [Entered: 05/13/2019 12:08 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/31/2019, for extension of time to file the record until 05/31/2019, filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell w/service 05/10/2019. [4786670] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:59 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell. w/service 04/10/2019 [4776399] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell - Joint Appendix - w/service 04/05/2019 [4774539] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:53 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell. No Transcript[4774521] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:13 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford for Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell w/service 04/05/2019 [4774519] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:07 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Arthur A. Benson II for Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell w/service 04/05/2019 [4774517] [19-1713] (AB) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:05 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/15/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Tyree Bell due 05/15/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4774487] [19-1713] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2019 11:23 AM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment both dated 3/21/2019. [4774484] [19-1713] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2019 11:21 AM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4774482] [19-1713] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2019 11:18 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4790875-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell. Brief of Tyree Bell due 06/17/2019. Appendix due on 06/17/2019. [4790911] [19-1713] (CMD) [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 06/17/2019, filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell w/service 05/23/2019. [4790875] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 05/23/2019 09:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4786670-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell. Brief of Tyree Bell due 05/31/2019. Appendix due on 05/31/2019. [4786986] [19-1713] (CMD) [Entered: 05/13/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/31/2019, for extension of time to file the record until 05/31/2019, filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell w/service 05/10/2019. [4786670] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell. w/service 04/10/2019 [4776399] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell - Joint Appendix - w/service 04/05/2019 [4774539] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell. No Transcript[4774521] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Jamie Kathryn Lansford for Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell w/service 04/05/2019 [4774519] [19-1713] (JKL) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Arthur A. Benson II for Appellant Mr. Tyree Bell w/service 04/05/2019 [4774517] [19-1713] (AB) [Entered: 04/05/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 05/15/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Tyree Bell due 05/15/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4774487] [19-1713] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment both dated 3/21/2019. [4774484] [19-1713] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2019 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4774482] [19-1713] (CMH) [Entered: 04/05/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamie Kathryn Lansford