This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 06:26:57 (UTC).

T.V.S., et al v. Akron Cty School Dist Bd of Ed, et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 T filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3054

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER HENDON, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity

JOHN/JANE DOE, Teacher, sued in his/her individual and official capacity; Employee, sued in his/her individual and official capacity

Defendant / Appellants

PHILOMENA VINCENTE

CHERYL ARNOLD

AKRON CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION

PATRICIA DERITA, in their Official and Individual Capacities

SUPERINTENDENT DAVID W. JAMES, Official Capacity Only

HOLLY DELISI

ANN WILD

AKRON CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Plaintiff / Appellees

T.V.S., A Minor, By and Through her Guardian, other T.S.

T.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Richard C.O. Rezie

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp

1501 Euclid Avenue, Sixth Floor

Cleveland, OH 44115

Steven Douglas Strang

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp

35 N. Fourth Street, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Edward L. Gilbert

Attorney at Law Offices

One Cascade Plaza, Suite 825

Akron, OH 44308

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) REPLY filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.S. and T.V.S. regarding Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Certificate of Service: 02/18/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:19 PM]

#22

(#22) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for attorney fees, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.V.S. and T.S.. Response from Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild Certificate of Service:02/12/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 02/12/2020 10:55 AM]

#21

(#21) MOTION filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.S. and T.V.S. for attorney fees. Certificate of Service: 02/03/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 02/03/2020 11:26 AM]

20 #2

judge order filed

20 #1

Cover Letter

#19

(#19) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to dismiss case - voluntarily, [ # 18 ]; previously filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District Board of Education, Akron City School District, David W. James, Philomena Vincente, Ann Wild, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi and Patricia Derita. Response from Attorney Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for Appellees T.S. and T.V.S. Certificate of Service:01/22/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:47 PM]

#18

(#18) MOTION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild to dismiss voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Certificate of Service: 01/22/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/22/2020 01:50 PM]

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to dismiss - jurisdiction, [ # 16 ]; previously filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.V.S. and T.S.. Response from Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild Certificate of Service:01/20/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/20/2020 05:43 PM]

#16

(#16) MOTION filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.S. and T.V.S. to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 01/17/2020 12:53 PM]

#15

(#15) MOTION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild to remand. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/16/2020 02:51 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees T.S. and T.V.S. by Edward L Gilbert. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 01/14/2020 04:22 PM]

#8

(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild. Certificate of Service:01/14/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/14/2020 08:22 AM]

#7

(#7) NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild regarding Appellants' Notice re: Transcripts on Appeal. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/14/2020 08:17 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild by Steven D. Strang. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [20-3054] (SDS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:21 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ann Wild, Philomena Vincente, Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita and David W. James by Richard C.O. Rezie. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:16 PM]

#4

(#20) ORDER filed: The motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal is GRANTED, with costs to be paid by the School. The motions to stay, remand, and dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. [ # 18 ], [ # 16 ], [ # 15 ], [ # 4 ]. Alan E. Norris, Circuit Judge; Jeffrey S. Sutton, Circuit Judge and John K. Bush, Circuit Judge. (BSM) [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:23 PM]

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:28 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Akron City School District and Akron City School District Board of Education. Transcript needed: y. (BSM) [Entered: 01/13/2020 02:57 PM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.S. and T.V.S. regarding Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Certificate of Service: 02/18/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 02/18/2020 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for attorney fees, [ # 21 ]; previously filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.V.S. and T.S.. Response from Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild Certificate of Service:02/12/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 02/12/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.S. and T.V.S. for attorney fees. Certificate of Service: 02/03/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 02/03/2020 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER filed: The motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal is GRANTED, with costs to be paid by the School. The motions to stay, remand, and dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. [ # 18 ], [ # 16 ], [ # 15 ], [ # 4 ]. Alan E. Norris, Circuit Judge; Jeffrey S. Sutton, Circuit Judge and John K. Bush, Circuit Judge. (BSM) [Entered: 01/23/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to dismiss case - voluntarily, [ # 18 ]; previously filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District Board of Education, Akron City School District, David W. James, Philomena Vincente, Ann Wild, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi and Patricia Derita. Response from Attorney Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for Appellees T.S. and T.V.S. Certificate of Service:01/22/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild to dismiss voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Certificate of Service: 01/22/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/22/2020 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion to dismiss - jurisdiction, [ # 16 ]; previously filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.V.S. and T.S.. Response from Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild Certificate of Service:01/20/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/20/2020 05:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION filed by Mr. Edward L. Gilbert for T.S. and T.V.S. to dismiss case for lack of jurisdiction. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 01/17/2020 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild to remand. Certificate of Service: 01/16/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/16/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild Certificate of Service: 01/15/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/15/2020 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees T.S. and T.V.S. by Edward L Gilbert. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2020. [20-3054] (ELG) [Entered: 01/14/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/14/2020 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild. Certificate of Service:01/14/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/14/2020 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild regarding Appellants' Notice re: Transcripts on Appeal. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/14/2020 08:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild by Steven D. Strang. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [20-3054] (SDS) [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Ann Wild, Philomena Vincente, Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita and David W. James by Richard C.O. Rezie. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/13/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION filed by Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild to stay injunction pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Richard C.O. Rezie for Appellants Akron City School District, Akron City School District Board of Education, Cheryl Arnold, Holly DeLisi, Patricia Derita, David W. James, Philomena Vincente and Ann Wild Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [20-3054] (RCR) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Briston Mitchell (BSM) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Akron City School District and Akron City School District Board of Education. Transcript needed: y. (BSM) [Entered: 01/13/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less