This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/09/2019 at 06:03:22 (UTC).

Turner v. Oklahoma County Board of Comm., et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Turner filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Oklahoma County Board of Comm ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-6092

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

STEPHEN SCOTT, an individual

SHERIFF JOHN WHETSEL, an individual

OKLAHOMA COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

OKLAHOMA COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, an Oklahoma governmental agency

Plaintiff / Appellant

RAUSHI TEAREZ TURNER, an individual

Lake Providence, LA 71254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Aaron Etherington

Attorney at Oklahoma County District Attorney

320 Robert S. Kerr Avenue, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-0000

Rodney J. Heggy

Attorney at Oklahoma County District Attorney

320 Robert S. Kerr Avenue, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-0000

Carri Ann Remillard

Attorney at Oklahoma County District Attorney

320 Robert S. Kerr Avenue, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Raushi Tearez Turner

Attorney at Riverbend Correctional Facility

9450 Highway 65 South

Lake Providence, LA 71254

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Volume I - Pleadings

Open Document #2

Volume II - Pleadings (continued)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10663452] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 2 - Pleadings. [19-6092] [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10663342] Order filed by Clerk of the Court referring the issue raised in the 6/11/19 order [ # 10655047-2 ] and appellant's response [ # 10662848-2 ] to the order to the panel of judges that will later be assigned to consider this case on the merits (no ruling will issue at this time). Served on 07/16/2019. [19-6092] [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10662848] Response filed by Raushi Tearez Turner to [ # 10655047-2 ] order to show cause. Served on 07/12/2019. Manner of Service: Clerk via email. [19-6092] [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10662462] Entry of appearance filed by Raushi Tearez Turner. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties named are parties to the appeal). Served on 06/20/2019 on court only. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-6092] [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10662346] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief, fee or 1915 forms and notice of appearance due 08/20/2019 for Raushi Tearez Turner. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 08/01/2019. [19-6092] [Entered: 07/11/2019 11:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655622] Entry of appearance filed by Rodney J Heggy, Aaron Etherington and Carri A. Remillard for John Whetsel, Stephen Scott, Oklahoma County Detention Center, Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners and John Whetsel. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-6092] [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docket[10655571] Entry of appearance submitted by Aaron Etherington; Rod Heggy; Carri Remillard for Appellees Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Detention Center, John Whetsel and Stephen Scott for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 06/13/2019 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 6/13/19][19-6092] AE [Entered: 06/13/2019 09:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655047] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause why appellant's right to appellate review of the 12/12/2018 order has not been waived by his failure to timely object to the 11/09/2018 R&R. Response due on 07/02/2019 for Raushi Tearez Turner. Current deadlines remain in place, but briefing on the merits is suspended. Served on 06/11/2019. [19-6092] [Entered: 06/11/2019 02:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Docket[10654976] Minute order filed - Notice of appearance due on 06/24/2019 for Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners. (Text Only - No Attachment. No NDA; for creation of deadline only.) [19-6092] [Entered: 06/11/2019 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10654762] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/10/2019. Fee or 1915 forms due in district court 07/10/2019 for Raushi Tearez Turner. Notice of appearance due on 06/24/2019 for Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners, Oklahoma County Detention Center, Stephen Scott and John Whetsel. Notice of appearance due on 07/10/2019 for Raushi Tearez Turner. [19-6092] --[Edited 06/11/2019 by SLS to add Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners.] [Entered: 06/10/2019 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oklahoma County Board of County Commissioners is a litigant

Latest cases where Oklahoma County Detention Center is a litigant