This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/29/2021 at 05:58:03 (UTC).

Turlock Irrigation District, et al v. FERC

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 Turlock Irrigation District, filed an Other lawsuit against FERC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1120

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Turlock Irrigation District

Modesto Irrigation District

Respondent

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Angela Jean Levin

Misha Tseytlin

Charles R. Sensiba

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document #2

[05/26/2021ORDER VACATING 05/25/2021ORDER]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1900212] filed consolidating cases; directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/25/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 06/25/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/25/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 06/25/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 06/25/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 06/25/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 07/12/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 06/25/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 06/25/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 07/12/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 07/12/2021 [21-1120, 21-1121]--[RELIEF ADDED--Edited 05/27/2021 by LMC] [Entered: 05/26/2021 02:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1900207] filed vacating clerk order [ # 1900089-3 ] [21-1120, 21-1121] [Entered: 05/26/2021 01:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[THIS ORDER VACATED BY ORDER OF 05/26/2021]--CLERK'S ORDER [1900089] filed consolidating cases 21-1121 (Consolidation started 05/25/2021) with 21-1120; directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/24/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/24/2021 [21-1120, 21-1121]--[Edited 05/26/2021 by SRJ] [Entered: 05/25/2021 04:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1900086] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1900083-2 ] [21-1120] [Entered: 05/25/2021 04:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1900083] of a decision by federal agency filed by Modesto Irrigation District and Turlock Irrigation District [Service Date: 05/21/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1120] [Entered: 05/25/2021 04:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1120] [Entered: 05/25/2021 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less