This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 06:06:20 (UTC).

Tunne v. Spears

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Tunne filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Spears. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-28

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Jose Moreno

Justice Jamie A. Rios

Justice Michelle Weston

The Estate of Fred Zeiss

Heather Ticotin

Lorena Moreno

Joshua Clinton Price

Mautner-Glick Corp., ("MGC")

Gerald P. Halpern, Esq.

Alvin Glick, Sr.

The Price Law Firm, PLLC

1115 Broadway, Suite 1053

New York, NY 10010

Judge Brenda S. Spears

Justice Michael L. Pesce

The City of New York

Alan Zeiss

Plaintiff / Appellant

Mark Tunne

New York, NY 10276

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

The Price Law Firm, PLLC

Attorney at The Price Law Firm, LLC

1115 Broadway, Suite 1053

New York, NY 10010

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mark Tunne

Attorney at Cooper Station

P.O. Box 235

New York, NY 10276

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis, [20], on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2792897] [20-28] [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:59 AM]

#19

(#19) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for any documents not submitted on time be accepted as late submissions relief, on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, [18],[18], on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2778453] [20-28] [Entered: 02/14/2020 09:44 AM]

#17

(#17) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, FILED. Service date 02/12/2020 by US mail.[2778435] [20-28] [Entered: 02/14/2020 09:39 AM]

#16

(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Mark Tunne, FILED. Service date 02/12/2020 by US mail.[2778425] [20-28] [Entered: 02/14/2020 09:36 AM]

#14

(#14) ORDER, dated 01/22/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/12/2020 unless Appellant Mark Tunne, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2757610] [20-28] [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:23 AM]

#13

(#13) ORDER, dated 01/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/07/2020 unless Appellant Mark Tunne, submits FORM D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2755075] [20-28] [Entered: 01/17/2020 09:54 AM]

#12

(#12) ORDER, dated 01/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/07/2020 unless Appellant Mark Tunne, submits filng fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2755065] [20-28] [Entered: 01/17/2020 09:49 AM]

#10

(#10) LETTER, dated 01/09/2020, on behalf of Appellee Michael L. Pesce, Jamie A. Rios, Brenda S. Spears, The City of New York and Michelle Weston, informing this Court, no longer identified as counsel for the listed Appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 01/09/2020 by US mail.[2748616] [20-28] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:52 PM]

#7

(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2746078] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:28 PM]

#6

(#6) NOTICE, to Appellee The Price Law Firm, PLLC, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2746071] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:25 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2746052] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:19 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 12/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2746028] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:11 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis, [20], on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2792897] [20-28] [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#20) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, FILED. No Service.[2792892] [20-28] [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for any documents not submitted on time be accepted as late submissions relief, on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, [18],[18], on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2778453] [20-28] [Entered: 02/14/2020 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#18) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for any documents not submitted on time be accepted as late submissions relief, on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, FILED. Service date 02/12/2020 by US mail.[2778443] [20-28] [Entered: 02/14/2020 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, FILED. Service date 02/12/2020 by US mail.[2778435] [20-28] [Entered: 02/14/2020 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Mark Tunne, FILED. Service date 02/12/2020 by US mail.[2778425] [20-28] [Entered: 02/14/2020 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER, dated 01/22/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/12/2020 unless Appellant Mark Tunne, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2757610] [20-28] [Entered: 01/22/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER, dated 01/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/07/2020 unless Appellant Mark Tunne, submits FORM D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2755075] [20-28] [Entered: 01/17/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER, dated 01/17/2020, dismissing appeal by 02/07/2020 unless Appellant Mark Tunne, submits filng fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2755065] [20-28] [Entered: 01/17/2020 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, James Edward Johnson, for Appellee Michael L. Pesce, Jamie A. Rios, Brenda S. Spears, The City of New York and Michelle Weston, TERMINATED.[2748620] [20-28] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER, dated 01/09/2020, on behalf of Appellee Michael L. Pesce, Jamie A. Rios, Brenda S. Spears, The City of New York and Michelle Weston, informing this Court, no longer identified as counsel for the listed Appellees, RECEIVED. Service date 01/09/2020 by US mail.[2748616] [20-28] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2746078] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE, to Appellee The Price Law Firm, PLLC, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2746071] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2746056] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2746052] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 12/20/2019, RECEIVED.[2746028] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mark Tunne, FILED. [2746012] [20-28] [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less