This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2021 at 06:09:30 (UTC).

True Harmony, et al v. California Department of Justi, et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 True Harmony filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against California Department of Justi. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55655

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

HUGH JOHN GIBSON

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

1130 HOPE STREET INVESTMENT ASSOCIATES, LLC, a California limited liability company

HOPE PARK LOFTS 2001-02910056 LLC

XAVIER BECERRA

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

DOES, 1 through 10 inclusive

ROSARIO PERRY

Santa Monica, CA 90405

NORMAN SOLOMON

BIMHF LLC

Plaintiff / Appellants

TRUE HARMONY, a registered public charity under Internal Revenue Code Section 501 (c)(3), and a California nonprofit public benefit corporation, ex rel. The Department of Justice of the State of California, a state agency, and Xavier Becerra, Attorne

RAY HAIEM

JEFFREY GRAY THOMAS

Santa Monica, CA 90401

1130 SOUTH HOPE STREET INVESTMENT ASSOCIATES LLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Hugh John Gibson

Attorney at Law Office of Hugh John Gibson ALC

9150 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 241

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Megan Anne Schultz Richards

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Rosario Perry Esquire

Attorney at ROSARIO PERRY LAW OFFICES

312 Pico Boulevard

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Juthamas Judy Suwatanapongched

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP

333 S Hope Street, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1448

Paul Sebastian Malingagio Esquire

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP

333 S Hope Street, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1448

Ariela Pier

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP

333 S Hope Street, 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1448

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey Gray Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Law Company

201 Wilshire Blvd.

Santa Monica, CA 90401

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed (ECF) Appellee Rosario Perry Correspondence: Plaintiff's counsel is disbarred and should not be allowed to litigate the appeal. Date of service: 07/09/2021 [12168456] [21-55655] (Perry, Rosario) [Entered: 07/09/2021 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12164593] (VS) [Entered: 07/07/2021 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Filed (ECF) Appellee Norman Solomon Correspondence: FURTHER INFORMATION FOR THE COURT'S CONSIDERATION IN CONNECTION WITH THE LACK OF CAPACITY OF DISBARRED AND SUSPENDED ATTORNEY JEFFREY THOMAS TO REPRESENT ANY CLIENTS IN THE ABOVE REFERENCED CASE - 21-55655.. Date of service: 06/30/2021 [12159609] [21-55655] (Gibson, Hugh) [Entered: 06/30/2021 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#14) Added Attorney(s) Ariela Pier for party(s) Appellee BIMHF LLC. [12159152] (RL) [Entered: 06/30/2021 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#13) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ariela R. Pier (Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton, LLP, 333 S. Hope St., 43rd Floor Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellee BIMHF LLC. Date of service: 06/30/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12159112] [21-55655] (Pier, Ariela) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellants 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates LLC,, Ray Haiem, Jeffrey Gray Thomas and True Harmony Correspondence: reply to appellees letter to the clerk dated June 29, 2021. Date of service: 06/30/2021 [12158934] [21-55655] (Thomas, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/30/2021 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#11) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/30/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12158541]. [21-55655] (AD) [Entered: 06/30/2021 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellants 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates LLC,, True Harmony, Jeffrey Gray Thomas and Ray Haiem Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/30/2021. [12158523] [21-55655] (Thomas, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellee Norman Solomon Correspondence: RE ABILITY OF JEFFREY THOMAS TO APPEAR IN THIS COURT ON BEHALF OF HIS FORMER CLIENTS GIVEN THAT HE HAS BEEN DISBARRED BY ORDER OF THE DISTRICT COURT AND IS SUSPENDED FROM PRACTICE BY THE STATE BAR COURT OF CALIFORNIA... Date of service: 06/29/2021 [12158461] [21-55655] (Gibson, Hugh) [Entered: 06/29/2021 07:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Paul Sebastian Malingagio for party(s) Appellee BIMHF LLC. [12157794] (RL) [Entered: 06/29/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Paul S. Malingagio (Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP, 333 S. Hope St., 43rd Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellee BIMHF LLC. Date of service: 06/29/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12157579] [21-55655] (Malingagio, Paul) [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docket(#6) Streamlined request [5] by Appellant 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates LLC, to extend time to file the brief is not approved because filer requested a previous extension of time. The filer must file a motion per 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(b). [12155909] (JN) [Entered: 06/28/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates LLC,. New requested due date is 10/28/2021. [12155388] [21-55655] (Thomas, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/25/2021 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#4) Entered appearance of Appellant 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates LLC,. (Listed on Appellant's Representation Statement) [12155267] (RT) [Entered: 06/25/2021 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY UPDATED. Streamlined request [2] by Appellants 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates LLC, Ray Haiem, Jeffrey Gray Thomas and True Harmony to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates LLC, Ray Haiem, Jeffrey Gray Thomas and True Harmony opening brief due 10/28/2021. Appellees 1130 Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC, BIMHF LLC, Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Does, Hugh John Gibson, Hope Park Lofts 2001-02910056 LLC, Rosario Perry and Norman Solomon answering brief due 11/29/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. (Updated to include all Appellants) [12154142]--[Edited 06/28/2021 by JN] (JN) [Entered: 06/25/2021 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Ray Haiem, Jeffrey Gray Thomas and True Harmony. New requested due date is 10/26/2021. [12154021] [21-55655] (Thomas, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/24/2021 08:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Ray Haiem, Jeffrey Gray Thomas and True Harmony Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/29/2021. Transcript ordered by 07/21/2021. Transcript due 08/20/2021. Appellants Ray Haiem, Jeffrey Gray Thomas and True Harmony opening brief due 09/28/2021. Appellees 1130 Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC, BIMHF LLC, Xavier Becerra, California Department of Justice, Does, Hugh John Gibson, Hope Park Lofts 2001-02910056 LLC, Rosario Perry and Norman Solomon answering brief due 10/28/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12151309] (RT) [Entered: 06/22/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1130 Hope Street investment Associates LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hope Park Lofts 2001-02910056 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Justice is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey G Thomas