This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2019 at 06:06:38 (UTC).

Trudy Callahan v. City of Jacksonville, Florida

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Trudy Callahan filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Jacksonville, Florida. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11432

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TRUDY CALLAHAN

Defendant / Appellee

CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Elizabeth Louise White

Attorney at Sheppard White Kachergus & DeMaggio, PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Camille Elizabeth Sheppard

Attorney at Sheppard White Kachergus & DeMaggio, PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

William J. Sheppard

Attorney at Sheppard White Kachergus & DeMaggio, PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Bryan E. DeMaggio

Attorney at Sheppard White Kachergus & DeMaggio, PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Jesse B. Wilkison

Attorney at Sheppard White Kachergus & DeMaggio, PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Matthew R. Kachergus

Attorney at Sheppard White Kachergus & DeMaggio, PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sean Bryan Granat

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

117 W Duval St Ste 480

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Craig Dennis Feiser

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

117 W Duval St Ste 480

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Wendy E. Byndloss

Attorney at Office of General Counsel

117 W Duval St Ste 480

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

EXT-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 06/25/2019 filed by Trudy Callahan. Motion is Unopposed. [8792354-1] [19-11432] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jesse B. Wilkison for Appellant Trudy Callahan. [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:49 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for Leave to File civil appeal statement Out of Time filed by Appellant Trudy Callahan is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8771123-2 ] [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:45 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Trudy Callahan. Motion is Unopposed. [8771123-1] [19-11432] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:07 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Craig Dennis Feiser for Appellee City of Jacksonville, Florida. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11432] (ECF: Craig Feiser) [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:28 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew R. Kachergus for Trudy Callahan. [19-11432] (ECF: Matthew Kachergus) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:33 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jesse B. Wilkison for Trudy Callahan. [19-11432] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:32 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew R. Kachergus for Appellant Trudy Callahan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11432] (ECF: Matthew Kachergus) [Entered: 04/30/2019 05:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wendy E. Byndloss for City of Jacksonville, Florida. [19-11432] (ECF: Wendy Byndloss) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:03 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig D. Feiser for City of Jacksonville, Florida [19-11432] (ECF: Craig Feiser) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:01 PM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Trudy Callahan. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:34 AM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #55

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Trudy Callahan is GRANTED. [ # 8792354-2 ] Appellants brief due on 06/25/2019. SM [Entered: 06/07/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 06/25/2019 filed by Trudy Callahan. Motion is Unopposed. [8792354-1] [19-11432] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Jesse B. Wilkison for Appellant Trudy Callahan. Appellants brief due on 06/11/2019 as to Appellant Trudy Callahan. Appendix due on 06/18/2019 as to Appellant Trudy Callahan. [Entered: 05/28/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Jesse B. Wilkison for Appellant Trudy Callahan. [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for Leave to File civil appeal statement Out of Time filed by Appellant Trudy Callahan is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8771123-2 ] [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for leave to file Civil Appeal Statement out of time filed by Trudy Callahan. Motion is Unopposed. [8771123-1] [19-11432] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 05/13/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Craig Dennis Feiser for Appellee City of Jacksonville, Florida. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11432] (ECF: Craig Feiser) [Entered: 05/10/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Attorney Bryan E. DeMaggio for Appellant Trudy Callahan has been notified that upon expiration of fourteen (14) days from this date, this appeal will be dismissed by the clerk without further notice unless the required Civil Appeal Statement has been received. A motion to file the Civil Appeal Statement out of time should also be filed at this time. [Entered: 05/07/2019 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew R. Kachergus for Trudy Callahan. [19-11432] (ECF: Matthew Kachergus) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jesse B. Wilkison for Trudy Callahan. [19-11432] (ECF: Jesse Wilkison) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew R. Kachergus for Appellant Trudy Callahan. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11432] (ECF: Matthew Kachergus) [Entered: 04/30/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Bryan E. DeMaggio for Trudy Callahan, Matthew R. Kachergus for Trudy Callahan, Camille Elizabeth Sheppard for Trudy Callahan, William J. Sheppard for Trudy Callahan and Elizabeth Louise White for Trudy Callahan. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 04/30/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sean Bryan Granat for City of Jacksonville, Florida. [19-11432] (ECF: Sean Granat) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wendy E. Byndloss for City of Jacksonville, Florida. [19-11432] (ECF: Wendy Byndloss) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Craig D. Feiser for City of Jacksonville, Florida [19-11432] (ECF: Craig Feiser) [Entered: 04/18/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Trudy Callahan. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/28/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 04/18/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Appellate fee was paid on 04/17/2019 as to Appellant Trudy Callahan. [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Trudy Callahan on 04/12/2019. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/29/2019 as to Appellant Trudy Callahan. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/13/2019 as to Appellee City of Jacksonville, Florida [Entered: 04/16/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.